EP0787855 - Process for the oleophobic and hydrophobic treatment of paper or cardboard [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.12.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELF ATOCHEM S.A. 4/8, Cours Michelet, La Défense 10 92800 Puteaux Hauts-de-Seine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/32] | For all designated states ELF ATOCHEM S.A. 4 & 8, Cours Michelet, La Défense 10 92800 Puteaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Corpart, Jean-Marc 3, Allée des Erables 95110 Sannois / FR | 02 /
Dessaint, André 17 B, Rue des Racques Boulincourt 60600 Clermont / FR | 03 /
Letellier, Jean-Claude 4, Rue du Général Delestraint 78520 Limay / FR | [1997/32] | Representative(s) | Leboulenger, Jean, et al Atofina D.C.R.D./D.P.I. 4, Cours Michelet La Défense 10 92091 Paris la Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/32] | Leboulenger, Jean, et al Elf Atochem S.A., Département Propriété Industrielle, Cedex 42 - La Défense 10 92091 Paris la Défense / FR | Application number, filing date | 97400118.2 | 21.01.1997 | [1997/32] | Priority number, date | FR19960001045 | 30.01.1996 Original published format: FR 9601045 | [1997/32] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0787855 | Date: | 06.08.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1997 | Classification | IPC: | D21H21/16, D21H27/10, // D21H17:28, D21H17:37, D21H17:49, D21H17:52, D21H17:55, D21H17:06 | [1997/32] | CPC: |
D21H17/29 (EP);
D21H17/06 (EP);
D21H17/37 (EP);
D21H17/55 (EP);
D21H21/16 (EP);
D21H27/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1997/32] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur oleophobierenden und hydrophobierenden Behandlung von Papier oder Pappe | [1997/32] | English: | Process for the oleophobic and hydrophobic treatment of paper or cardboard | [1997/32] | French: | Procédé pour traitement oléophobe et hydrophobe du papier ou du carton | [1997/32] | Examination procedure | 25.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/32] | 03.08.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/04] | 01.09.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2000/04] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1999 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]EP0542598 (ATOCHEM ELF SA [FR]) [DY] 1-4,8,10 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5387640 (MICHELS GISBERT [DE], et al) [Y] 1-4,8,10 * column W *; | [A]EP0034527 (ATOCHEM [FR]) [A] 1,2,8,10 * page 11, line 22 - page 12, line 9 *; | [A]EP0664357 (CELTA [FR]) [A] 1,3,10 * claims 1,4,5 * | by applicant | EP0542598 |