EP0855268 - Device for fixing a printing sleeve on an plate cylinder shaft [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.05.2002 [2002/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KOMORI-CHAMBON SA 6, rue Auguste Rodin 45060 Orléans / FR | [1998/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Six, Bernard 144, Rue des Vanneaux 45160 Olivet / FR | [1998/31] | Representative(s) | Bruder, Michel, et al Cabinet Guiu & Bruder 68, rue d'Hauteville 75010 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/31] | Bruder, Michel, et al Cabinet Bruder 46, rue Decamps 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 97400193.5 | 28.01.1997 | [1998/31] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0855268 | Date: | 29.07.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0855268 | Date: | 06.06.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B41F27/10 | [1998/31] | CPC: |
B41F27/105 (EP);
B41P2227/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1998/31] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Fixieren von einer Druckhülse auf einem Druckwalzenkern | [1998/31] | English: | Device for fixing a printing sleeve on an plate cylinder shaft | [1998/31] | French: | Dispositif de fixation d'un manchon sur un axe d'un cylindre porte-clichés | [1998/31] | Examination procedure | 18.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/08] | 16.08.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.11.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.03.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1301940 (SAUERESSIG KG MASCHINENFABRIK) [X] 1,3-5,8 * column 2, line 45 - column 4, line 4; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US3096949 (HUFFMAN HAROLD W) [A] 1 * column 2, line 7 - column 3, line 8; figure - *; | [A]US4794858 (KATZ SIDNEY [US]) [A] 1 * column A; figure . *; | [A]US5507228 (SCHULZ WERNER [US]) [A] 1 * column A; figure - * |