EP0805262 - Device for applying lining units within a tunnel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.08.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.10.2002 [2002/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEYRPIC FRAMATOME MECANIQUE Tour Framatome, 1 Place de la Coupole 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [1997/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bibes, Jean-Pierre 20 rue Pierre Bouvier 69270 Fontaine sur Saone / FR | 02 /
Chareyre, Gérard 7, rue du Professeur Florence 69003 Lyon / FR | [1997/45] | Representative(s) | Lanceplaine, Jean-Claude, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/45] | Lanceplaine, Jean-Claude, et al CABINET LAVOIX 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 97400360.0 | 18.02.1997 | [1997/45] | Priority number, date | FR19960005584 | 03.05.1996 Original published format: FR 9605584 | [1997/45] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0805262 | Date: | 05.11.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | E21D11/40, E21D11/08 | [1997/45] | CPC: |
E21D11/08 (EP);
E21D11/40 (EP);
E21D11/403 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1997/45] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Montieren der Ausbauelemente innerhalb eines Tunnels | [1997/45] | English: | Device for applying lining units within a tunnel | [1997/45] | French: | Dispositif de pose de voussoirs à l'intérieur d'un tunnel | [1997/45] | Examination procedure | 29.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/45] | 30.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.05.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0231655 (KAWASAKI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]DE3641636 (GEWERK EISENHUETTE WESTFALIA) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]DE1534602 (BADE & CO GMBH) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]BE904490 (N.V. KEMPENSE) [A] 1 * figure - * |