EP0793060 - Moisture-absorbing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/36] | Moisture-absorbingdevice | ||
[2001/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.12.2002 [2002/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel France Société Anonyme 161, Rue de Silly 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [1997/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hemon-Laurens, Jacques Rue du Pont 51520- Sogny-au-Moulin / FR | 02 /
Berger, Jacques 14 Lotissement les Bleuets 27400 - Acquigny / FR | 03 /
Tapiero, François 45, rue des Volontaires 75015 - Paris / FR | [1997/36] | Representative(s) | Hasenrader, Hubert Karl, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/36] | Hasenrader, Hubert, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 97400444.2 | 27.02.1997 | [1997/36] | Priority number, date | FR19960002383 | 27.02.1996 Original published format: FR 9602383 | [1997/36] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0793060 | Date: | 03.09.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0793060 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F24F3/14 | [1997/36] | CPC: |
F24F3/1411 (EP);
F24F2003/144 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/36] | Title | German: | Feuchtigkeitsabsorbierendes Gerät | [1997/36] | English: | Moisture-absorbing device | [2001/19] | French: | Dispositif d'absorption d'humidité | [1997/36] |
Former [1997/36] | Moisture-absorbingdevice | Examination procedure | 27.10.1997 | Examination requested [1997/52] | 23.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2067428 (ZEIDLER HOLMGREN HANDEL) [Y] 1,2,4,6,7 * the whole document *; | [YA]EP0116239 (MUTANDIS SARL [FR]) [Y] 1,2,4,6,7 * the whole document * [A] 3,5,8,9; | [A]DE8816583U (WENKO WENSELAAR) [A] 1* abstract * |