EP0798012 - Valve for the treatment of hydrocephalus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.08.2002 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CORDIS S.A. 5 rue de Ris F-91170 Viry-Châtillon / FR | [1997/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lecuyer, Alain 99 avenue Sidi Brahim, Les Micocouliers"-C2 06130 Grasse / FR | 02 /
Sainte-Rose, Christian, Prof. 120 avenue Gambetta 92170 Vanves / FR | [1997/40] | Representative(s) | Geismar, Thierry, et al NOVAGRAAF IP 122, rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR | [2009/37] |
Former [2001/14] | Geismar, Thierry, et al Bouju Derambure Bugnion, 52, rue de Monceau 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1997/40] | Geismar, Thierry Cabinet Geismar, 90 avenue Mozart 75016 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 97400643.9 | 21.03.1997 | [1997/40] | Priority number, date | FR19960003726 | 26.03.1996 Original published format: FR 9603726 | [1997/40] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0798012 | Date: | 01.10.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0798012 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61M27/00 | [1997/40] | CPC: |
A61M27/006 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/40] | Title | German: | Ventil zur Behandlung von Hydrocephalus | [1997/40] | English: | Valve for the treatment of hydrocephalus | [1997/40] | French: | Valve pour le traitement de l'hydrocéphalie | [1997/40] | Examination procedure | 26.03.1998 | Examination requested [1998/22] | 06.09.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.01.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1999 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.04.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.10.2001 | FI | 17.10.2001 | IE | 17.10.2001 | NL | 17.10.2001 | DK | 17.01.2002 | PT | 17.01.2002 | SE | 17.01.2002 | GR | 18.01.2002 | LU | 21.03.2002 | MC | 21.03.2002 | BE | 31.03.2002 | CH | 31.03.2002 | LI | 31.03.2002 | ES | 30.04.2002 | [2004/51] |
Former [2004/39] | AT | 17.10.2001 | |
FI | 17.10.2001 | ||
IE | 17.10.2001 | ||
NL | 17.10.2001 | ||
DK | 17.01.2002 | ||
PT | 17.01.2002 | ||
SE | 17.01.2002 | ||
LU | 21.03.2002 | ||
MC | 21.03.2002 | ||
BE | 31.03.2002 | ||
CH | 31.03.2002 | ||
LI | 31.03.2002 | ||
ES | 30.04.2002 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 17.10.2001 | |
FI | 17.10.2001 | ||
IE | 17.10.2001 | ||
NL | 17.10.2001 | ||
DK | 17.01.2002 | ||
PT | 17.01.2002 | ||
SE | 17.01.2002 | ||
MC | 21.03.2002 | ||
BE | 31.03.2002 | ||
CH | 31.03.2002 | ||
LI | 31.03.2002 | ||
ES | 30.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/48] | AT | 17.10.2001 | |
FI | 17.10.2001 | ||
IE | 17.10.2001 | ||
NL | 17.10.2001 | ||
DK | 17.01.2002 | ||
PT | 17.01.2002 | ||
SE | 17.01.2002 | ||
MC | 21.03.2002 | ||
BE | 31.03.2002 | ||
CH | 31.03.2002 | ||
LI | 31.03.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 17.10.2001 | |
FI | 17.10.2001 | ||
IE | 17.10.2001 | ||
NL | 17.10.2001 | ||
DK | 17.01.2002 | ||
PT | 17.01.2002 | ||
SE | 17.01.2002 | ||
MC | 21.03.2002 | ||
CH | 31.03.2002 | ||
LI | 31.03.2002 | ||
Former [2003/31] | AT | 17.10.2001 | |
FI | 17.10.2001 | ||
IE | 17.10.2001 | ||
NL | 17.10.2001 | ||
PT | 17.01.2002 | ||
SE | 17.01.2002 | ||
MC | 21.03.2002 | ||
CH | 31.03.2002 | ||
LI | 31.03.2002 | ||
Former [2003/25] | AT | 17.10.2001 | |
FI | 17.10.2001 | ||
IE | 17.10.2001 | ||
NL | 17.10.2001 | ||
PT | 17.01.2002 | ||
SE | 17.01.2002 | ||
MC | 21.03.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 17.10.2001 | |
FI | 17.10.2001 | ||
IE | 17.10.2001 | ||
NL | 17.10.2001 | ||
PT | 17.01.2002 | ||
SE | 17.01.2002 | ||
Former [2002/48] | FI | 17.10.2001 | |
IE | 17.10.2001 | ||
PT | 17.01.2002 | ||
SE | 17.01.2002 | ||
Former [2002/33] | FI | 17.10.2001 | |
SE | 17.01.2002 | ||
Former [2002/27] | SE | 17.01.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US4781672 (HOOVEN MICHAEL D [US]) [DA] 1 * column A; figure - *; | [A]FR2698535 (DREVET JEAN BAPTISTE [FR], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [PA]US5520632 (LEVEEN ROBERT F [US], et al) [PA] 1* column 5, line 3 - column 6, line 14; figures 1-6 * |