EP0801503 - Multiple mode trellis decoder for a digital signal processing system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 13.07.2011 [2011/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON multimedia 46 quai A. Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cédex / FR | [2009/40] |
Former [1997/42] | For all designated states THOMSON multimedia 46, Quai A. Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hu, Keren THOMSON Multimedia, 46 quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | 02 /
Lin, William Wei-Lian THOMSON Multimedia, 46 quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | 03 /
Caldwell, Maurice David THOMSON Multimedia, 46 quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | [1997/42] | Representative(s) | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte Technicolor European Patent Operations 1-5 Rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte Thomson multimedia Patent Department 46 Quai A. le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | ||
Former [1997/42] | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte THOMSON multimedia, 46 quai A. Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 97400765.0 | 03.04.1997 | [1997/42] | Priority number, date | US19960629680 | 09.04.1996 Original published format: US 629680 | [1997/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0801503 | Date: | 15.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0801503 | Date: | 10.02.1999 | [1999/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0801503 | Date: | 30.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/21, H04L1/00 | [2005/05] | CPC: |
H04N21/2383 (EP,US);
H03M13/35 (EP,US);
H03M13/39 (EP,US);
H04N21/4382 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/06] | H04N7/24, H03M13/00, H04N5/21, H04L1/00 | ||
Former IPC [1997/42] | H04N7/24, H03M13/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/42] | Title | German: | Mehrfachmodusdekoder für ein digitales Signalverarbeitungssystem | [1997/42] | English: | Multiple mode trellis decoder for a digital signal processing system | [1997/42] | French: | Décodeur à mode multiple pour un système de traitement de signal numérique | [1997/42] | Examination procedure | 30.07.1999 | Examination requested [1999/39] | 30.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 17.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 24.06.2004 | Appeal received No. T1163/04 | 14.09.2004 | Statement of grounds filed | 16.05.2007 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure | Opposition(s) | 01.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 25.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 30.09.2009 | [2011/28] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0677965 (GOLD STAR CO [KR]); | [E]US5648822 (HULYALKAR SAMIR N [US]) | Examination | WO9602108 |