Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH1045182 | Global Dossier | 17.02.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9604188 | 03.04.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0799588 | Global Dossier | 27.06.2001 | B1 | EP0799588 | 08.10.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9604188 | 03.04.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9701621 | 03.11.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9604188 | 03.04.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2201637 | 03.10.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9604188 | 03.04.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69705339T | 28.02.2002 | T2 | DE69705339D1 | 02.08.2001 | D1 | Priority number | Date | FR9604188 | 03.04.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2159820T | 16.10.2001 | T3 | Priority number | Date | FR9604188 | 03.04.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2747106 | 15.05.1998 | B1 | FR2747106 | 10.10.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9604188 | 03.04.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX9702408 | 31.03.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9604188 | 03.04.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5845651 | 08.12.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9604188 | 03.04.1996 |