EP0799588 - Device for storing and applying a haircare product [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.2002 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/41] | For all designated states L'OREAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
de Nervo, Stanislas Shoto Park Hills Shoto, 2-2-1 Shibya-ku Tokyo 151 / JP | [1997/41] | Representative(s) | Leszczynski, André Cabinet Nony 3, rue de Penthièvre 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/41] | Leszczynski, André NONY & ASSOCIES 29, rue Cambacérès 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 97400774.2 | 03.04.1997 | [1997/41] | Priority number, date | FR19960004188 | 03.04.1996 Original published format: FR 9604188 | [1997/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0799588 | Date: | 08.10.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0799588 | Date: | 27.06.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A45D19/02, A45D24/22 | [1997/41] | CPC: |
A45D24/22 (EP,US);
A45D19/026 (EP,US);
B65D47/10 (EP,US);
B65D47/36 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1997/41] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Aufbewahren und Auftragen eines Haarpflegeproduktes | [1997/41] | English: | Device for storing and applying a haircare product | [1997/41] | French: | Dispositif de conditionnement et d'application d'un produit capillaire | [1997/41] | Examination procedure | 11.02.1998 | Examination requested [1998/15] | 15.09.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.10.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.03.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1134371 (BETTS & CO LTD) [A] 5 * the whole document *; | [A]FR1203209 (EMBALLAGES PLASTIQUES SOC D) [A] 2 * the whole document *; | [DA]US3477447 (ELDREDGE GLADYS C); | [A]US3570499 (RUTA FRANCESCA) [A] 1,6 * column W *; | [A]US3591053 (THOMAS ORRIN H) [A] 1,7 * column W *; | [A]DE2557476 (MOZES MIKLOS DIPL ING); | [A]US4319701 (CAMBIO ORLANDO D) [A] 1 * column 2, line 58 - column 3, line 9; figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP0150751 (PHARMACIA AS [DK]); | [A]GB2206567 (PERMABOND ADHESIVES); | [A]US5361947 (LIFSHEY ARTHUR L [US]) [A] 1,3,4 * column W * |