EP0806673 - Apparatus for detecting the speed of a rotating element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.06.2002 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.08.2002 [2002/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SSI TECHNOLOGIES, INC. 3200 Palmer Drive Janesville Wisconsin 53546 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/46] | For all designated states SSI TECHNOLOGIES, INC. 3200 Palmer Drive Janesville, Wisconsin 53546 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Seefeldt, James D. 4463 Meadow Circle Deforest, WI 53532 / US | [1997/46] | Representative(s) | Orès, Bernard, et al Cabinet ORES 36, rue de St Pétersbourg 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/46] | Orès, Bernard, et al Cabinet ORES 6, Avenue de Messine 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 97400780.9 | 04.04.1997 | [1997/46] | Priority number, date | US19960647308 | 09.05.1996 Original published format: US 647308 | [1997/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0806673 | Date: | 12.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0806673 | Date: | 08.07.1998 | [1998/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G01P3/488, G01P3/489, G01P3/487, G01D5/16 | [1998/28] | CPC: |
G01P3/489 (EP,US);
G01P3/488 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/46] | G01P3/488, G01P3/489 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1997/46] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Ermittlung der Geschwindigkeit eines rotierenden Elements | [1997/46] | English: | Apparatus for detecting the speed of a rotating element | [1997/46] | French: | Appareil de détection de la vélocité d'un élément rotatif | [1997/46] | Examination procedure | 26.08.1998 | Examination requested [1998/44] | 30.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.10.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/33] | 12.03.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2002/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2002 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5293125 (GRIFFEN NEIL C [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * column 12, line 60 - column 13, line 44 *; | [Y]DE4301704 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 1-7,9 * column 3, line 62 - column 4, line 18 * * column 5, line 5 - line 21; figure - *; | [Y]US4490674 (ITO SUSUMU [JP]) [Y] 10 * column 4, line 8 - line 21; figure 6 *; | [Y]GB2034053 (SONY CORP) [Y] 8 * page 6, line 29 - page 7, line 29; figures 13,14 *; | [PY]US5600238 (HOLLOWAY HENRY [US], et al) [PY] 1-7,9 * column 5, line 62 - line 65 * * column 3, line 32 - column 4, line 15; figures 1,5-8 * |