EP0872426 - Portable container made of semi rigid material,particularly for bottles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.2004 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.08.2004 [2004/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMURFIT-SOCAR 5, Avenue du Général de Gaulle F-94160 Saint-Mandé / FR | [1998/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chabot, Roland La grave Monbadon 33570 Puisseguin / FR | 02 /
Syras, Hervé 10, rue des Cheminots 33230 Abzac / FR | [1998/43] | Representative(s) | Jolly, Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet Jolly 54, rue de Clichy 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/43] | Jolly, Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet Jolly 54, rue de Clichy 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 97400877.3 | 18.04.1997 | [1998/43] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0872426 | Date: | 21.10.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0872426 | Date: | 13.08.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B65D5/36, B65D5/48 | [1998/43] | CPC: |
B65D5/3685 (EP);
B65D5/4802 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IE, IT, NL, PT [1998/43] | Title | German: | Tragbare Verpackung aus halbsteifem Material,insbesondere für Flaschen | [1998/43] | English: | Portable container made of semi rigid material,particularly for bottles | [1998/43] | French: | Conditionnement portable, en un matériau semi-rigide, notamment pour bouteilles | [1998/43] | Examination procedure | 27.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/17] | 06.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3212636 (BENNET) [A] 1,6-9 * column W *; | [A]FR2187619 (SOFHUNIC SA) [A] 1,9,10 * figure - * | [A] - "Italiaanse Oscars 1959", VERPAKKING, ROTTERDAM NL, (195907), vol. 11, no. 11, page 842, XP002022588 [A] 1-3 |