EP0806581 - Clutch release bearing with an resilient ring [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.05.2002 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.07.2002 [2002/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SKF FRANCE 8, Avenue Réaumur F-92140 Clamart / FR | [1997/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ponson, Frédéric 14, rue A. Malraux 37230 Luynes / FR | 02 /
Collignon, Bertrand 155, Bld. Charles de Gaulle 37540 Saint-Cyr-sur-Loire / FR | 03 /
Arnault, Benoît 36, rue de Lille 37000 Tours / FR | 04 /
Brulard, Cédric 27, Bld. Preuilly - Bat.3 37000 Tours / FR | [1997/46] | Representative(s) | Casalonga, Axel Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/46] | Casalonga, Axel BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Morassistrasse 8 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97400916.9 | 23.04.1997 | [1997/46] | Priority number, date | FR19960005799 | 09.05.1996 Original published format: FR 9605799 | [1997/46] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0806581 | Date: | 12.11.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0806581 | Date: | 18.07.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F16D23/14 | [1997/46] | CPC: |
F16C27/04 (KR);
F16D23/14 (EP,KR);
F16D23/142 (EP);
F16D2300/08 (EP);
F16D2300/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1997/46] | Title | German: | Kupplungsausrücklager mit einem elastischen Ring | [1997/46] | English: | Clutch release bearing with an resilient ring | [1997/46] | French: | Dispositif de butée d'embrayage à rondelle élastique | [1997/46] | Examination procedure | 30.10.1997 | Examination requested [1998/06] | 05.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.01.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.04.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]DE19503218 (SCHAEFFLER WAELZLAGER KG [DE]) [PX] 1-3,8,10,12 * the whole document *; | [A]US4815867 (LADIN ELI M [US]) [A] 1,2,4,5,7 * column W *; | [A]FR2533279 (VALEO [FR]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2533281 (VALEO [FR]) [A] 1,9 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2577291 (VALEO [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0276613 (VALEO [FR]) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]DE4327879 (SCHAEFFLER WAELZLAGER KG [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document * | Examination | FR2559861 |