EP0809372 - Optical network unit and central unit of an optical communication network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.06.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2008 | Change - representative | published on 12.11.2008 [2008/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [1999/08] |
Former [1997/48] | For all designated states ALCATEL ALSTHOM COMPAGNIE GENERALE D'ELECTRICITE 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pfeiffer, Thomas Lenzkircherstrasse 5A 70569 Stuttgart / DE | [1997/48] | Representative(s) | Knecht, Ulrich Karl, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 70430 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | Knecht, Ulrich Karl, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 70430 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1997/48] | Knecht, Ulrich Karl, Dipl.-Ing., et al Alcatel Alsthom Intellectual Property Department, Postfach 30 09 29 70449 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 97401047.2 | 09.05.1997 | [1997/48] | Priority number, date | DE1996120723 | 23.05.1996 Original published format: DE 19620723 | [1997/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0809372 | Date: | 26.11.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0809372 | Date: | 21.04.2004 | [2004/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04J14/00 | [2004/17] | CPC: |
H04J14/005 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/48] | H04J13/00, H04J14/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1997/48] | Title | German: | Optische Netzwerkeinheit und Zentrale eines optischen Kommunikationsnetzes | [1997/48] | English: | Optical network unit and central unit of an optical communication network | [1997/48] | French: | Terminaison optique et noeud central d'un réseau optique de communication | [1997/48] | Examination procedure | 22.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/30] | 18.02.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 30.11.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2004 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - LEICH M., KAO M. S., "Proposal of an all-optical LAN using distance multiplexing for protocol free transmission", TWELFTH ANNUAL CONFERENCE ON EUROPEAN FIBRE OPTIC COMMUNICATIONS AND NETWORKS. PROCEEDINGS. PAPERS ON OPTICAL COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS AND OPTICAL ACCESS NETWORKS, HEIDELBERG, GERMANY, 21-24 JUNE 1994, (1994), pages 106 - 108, XP009026624 [X] 1-11 * the whole document * | [A] - PRUCNAL P R ET AL, "SPREAD SPECTRUM FIBER-OPTIC LOCAL AREA NETWORK USING OPTICAL PROCESSING", JOURNAL OF LIGHTWAVE TECHNOLOGY, IEEE. NEW YORK, US, (19860501), vol. 4, no. 5, ISSN 0733-8724, pages 547 - 554, XP000606949 [A] 1-11 * abstract * * I. Introduction; IV. Experiment;; figures 7,9 * | [A] - SALEHI J A, "CODE DIVISION MULTIPLE-ACCESS TECHNIQUES IN OPTICAL FIBER NETWORKS-PART I: FUNDAMENTAL PRINCIPLES", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (19890801), vol. 37, no. 8, ISSN 0090-6778, pages 824 - 833, XP000047621 [A] 1-11 * abstract * * I. Introduction; II. Optical Orthogonal Codes (OOC'S); III. FO-CDMA Experiment Using Optical Orthogonal Codes * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/26.31181 |