EP0808845 - New 1- or 6-hydroxylated steroids, a process for their production, their use as medicaments and pharmaceutical compositions containing them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.08.2002 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aventis Pharma S.A. 20, avenue Raymond Aron 92160 Antony / FR | [2001/14] |
Former [1998/16] | For all designated states HOECHST MARION ROUSSEL 1, Terrasse Bellini 92800 Puteaux / FR | ||
Former [1997/48] | For all designated states ROUSSEL-UCLAF 102, route de Noisy Boîte postale no.9 93230 Romainville / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Biton, Jacques 9, Impasse Dagobert 60610 La Croix Saint Ouen / FR | 02 /
Azerad, Robert 13 bis, rue Berthelot 91130 Ris Orangis / FR | 03 /
Marchandeau, Jean-Pierre 3, rue de Douy 77410 Annet Sur Marne / FR | 04 /
Lacroix, Isabelle 1, Avenue des Marronniers 94600 Choisy Le Roi / FR | [1997/48] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1998/16] |
Former [1997/48] | Vieillefosse, Jean-Claude, et al ROUSSEL UCLAF, Département des Brevets, 111, Route de Noisy 93235 Romainville Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 97401111.6 | 21.05.1997 | [1997/48] | Priority number, date | FR19960006350 | 22.05.1996 Original published format: FR 9606350 | [1997/48] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0808845 | Date: | 26.11.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0808845 | Date: | 16.09.1998 | [1998/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0808845 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C07J9/00, A61K31/575 | [1997/48] | CPC: |
C07J9/00 (EP,US);
A61P5/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1997/48] | Title | German: | Neue 1- oder 6-hydroxylierte Steroide, ein Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung, ihre Verwendung als Medikamenten und pharmazeutische Präparate davon | [1997/48] | English: | New 1- or 6-hydroxylated steroids, a process for their production, their use as medicaments and pharmaceutical compositions containing them | [1997/48] | French: | Nouveaux stéroides 1 ou 6-hydroxylés, leur procédé de préparation, leur application à titre de médicaments et les compositions pharmaceutiques les renfermant | [1997/48] | Examination procedure | 16.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/19] | 17.07.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.10.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [2007/17] | LU | 31.05.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3546259 (BOSWELL GEORGE A JR, et al) [A] 1-16 * example XIV *; | [DA]EP0007823 (ROUSSEL UCLAF [FR]) [DA] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A] - NIKOLAICHUK S P, "Biological activity of 6.alpha.-methoxyprogesterone", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19740527), vol. 080, no. 21, Database accession no. 116524, XP002019367 [A] 1-16 * abstract * | [ ] - FARMAKOL. TOKSIKOL., (1973), vol. 8, pages 88 - 90 | [A] - OKADA H ET AL, "Steroid specificity of the progestogen receptor of rabbit uterus. II", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19750623), vol. 082, no. 25, Database accession no. 165103, XP002019368 [A] 1-16 * abstract * | [ ] - NIPPON NAIBUMPI GAKKAI ZASSHI, (1974), vol. 50, no. 12, pages 1543 - 1547 | [A] - SEELEY D H ET AL, "Molecular interactions of progesterone analogs with rabbit uterine cytoplasmic receptor", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, MD US, (1982), vol. 257, no. 22, pages 13359 - 13366, XP002019365 [A] 1-16 * page 13364, column 1, paragraph 5 * | [A] - MCGUIRE J L ET AL, "Interaction between steroids and a uterine progestogen specific binding macromolecule", BIOCHEMISTRY, EASTON, PA US, (1974), vol. 13, no. 2, pages 319 - 322, XP002019366 [A] 1-16 * page 321; examples 29,31; table I * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi00699a014 | [A] - F. KOBAYASHI ET AL, "Inhibitory and Facilitatory Effects of Steroids on the Release of Luteinising Hormone in the Rat", ENDOCRINOLOGIA JAPONICA, (196910), vol. 16, no. 5, pages 493 - 499, XP000610857 [A] 1-16 * page 496; table 5 * | [A] - H. E. SMITH ET AL, "Binding of Steroids to Progesterone Receptor Proteins in Chick Oviduct and Human Uterus", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, MD US, (19740925), vol. 249, no. 18, pages 5924 - 5932, XP000610861 [A] 1-16 * page 5925, composé II-8; page 5927 * |