EP0816632 - Apparatus and method for information transmission by electromagnetic waves [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2004 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.08.2004 [2004/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Geoservices 7, rue Isaac Newton 93151 Le Blanc-Mesnil / FR | [1998/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Soulier, Louis 5, Chemin du Clos de la Fontaine 95110 Sannois / FR | [1998/02] | Representative(s) | Benoist, François, et al Institut Français du Pétrole 1 et 4, avenue de Bois-Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | Benoist, François, et al Institut Français du Pétrole 1 et 4, avenue de Bois-Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | ||
Former [1998/02] | Andreeff, François, et al Institut Français du Petrole, 4, avenue de Bois-Préau 92852 Rueil Malmaison / FR | Application number, filing date | 97401341.9 | 13.06.1997 | [1998/02] | Priority number, date | FR19960008256 | 01.07.1996 Original published format: FR 9608256 | [1998/02] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0816632 | Date: | 07.01.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0816632 | Date: | 03.09.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | E21B47/12 | [1998/02] | CPC: |
E21B47/26 (EP,US);
E21B47/13 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB, IT [1998/02] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Übertragung von Nachrichten mittels elektromagnetischer Wellen | [1998/02] | English: | Apparatus and method for information transmission by electromagnetic waves | [1998/02] | French: | Dispositif et méthode de transmission d'informations par onde électromagnétique | [1998/02] | Examination procedure | 07.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/36] | 12.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]WO9206278 (METROL TECH LTD [GB]) [YD] 1-15 * page 3, line 35 - page 5, line 30 * * figure 1 *; | [YD]US5394141 (SOULIER LOUIS [FR]) [YD] 1-15 * abstract * * column 3, lines 47-53 * * column 5, line 44 - column 8, line 67 * * figures 2-11 *; | [Y]EP0296178 (STEWART CHARLES L) [Y] 3 * page 4, line 40 - page 5, line 18 * * figure 1 *; | [Y]US4093936 (EBERLINE HOWARD C, et al) [Y] 4,14 * column 1, lines 43-52 *; | [YA]US5396232 (MATHIEU YVES M G [FR], et al) [Y] 15 * column 3, line 10 - column 4, line 5 * * figures 1,2 * * column 2, lines 9-14 * * column 3, lines 35-39 * * column 3, lines 51-56 * [A] 1,12; | [A]US5512889 (FLETCHER PAUL A [US]) [A] 1,12; | [A] - LOUIS SOULIER, MICHEL LEMAITRE, "E.M. MWD Data Transmission Status and Perspectives", SPE/IADC # 25686, AMSTERDAM, (19930223), pages 121 - 128, XP002034537 [A] 1 * the whole document * | [A] - R. MAGLIONE, B. BURBAN, L. SOULIER, "Electromagetic Transmission Improvements applied to On/Offshore Drilling In The Mediterranean Area", SPE # 28290, (19940214), pages 1 - 26, XP002034538 [A] 1 * the whole document * |