EP0819428 - Composition containing a combination of a volatile compound and a polyvinylpyrrolidone derivative polymer and use thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.07.2001 [2001/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/04] | For all designated states L'OREAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arnaud, Pascal 43, Avenue du Général P.Billotte 94000 Creteil / FR | 02 /
Agostini, Isabelle 48, rue des Prés Hauts 92290 Chatenay Malabry / FR | [1998/04] | Representative(s) | Dodin, Catherine L'Oréal Service DIPI 9 Rue Pierre Dreyfus 92110 Clichy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/04] | Dodin, Catherine L'Oreal-D.P.I., 90, rue du Général Roguet 92583 Clichy Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 97401458.1 | 23.06.1997 | [1998/04] | Priority number, date | FR19960008955 | 17.07.1996 Original published format: FR 9608955 | [1998/04] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0819428 | Date: | 21.01.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0819428 | Date: | 19.08.1998 | [1998/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0819428 | Date: | 09.08.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/48, A61K7/027 | [1998/04] | CPC: |
A61K8/8182 (EP);
A61K8/585 (EP);
A61Q1/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1999/18] |
Former [1998/04] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Zusammensetzung enthaltend die Kombination einer flüchtige Substanze und einer Polyvinylpyrrolidon-Derivat-Polymer und ihre Verwendung | [1998/04] | English: | Composition containing a combination of a volatile compound and a polyvinylpyrrolidone derivative polymer and use thereof | [1998/04] | French: | Composition comprenant l'association d'un composé volatil et d'un polymère dérivé de polyvinyl-pyrrolidone, et utilisation de ladite association | [1998/04] | Examination procedure | 06.08.1998 | Examination requested [1998/42] | 06.08.1998 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 04.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.03.1999 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 15.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.05.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.06.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 10.05.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0430473 (RICHARDSON-VICKS) [Y] 1-35 * page 6, line 25 - page 7, line 26; example V; claims 1-8 *; | [Y]US5480632 (C.C. ORR ET EL.) [Y] 1-35 * column 4, line 15 - column 5, line 10; examples 3,5; claim 1 *; | [Y]US5389363 (F. SNYDER ET AL.) [Y] 1-35 * examples 1-3; claims 1-19 *; | [DY]EP0602905 (REVLON) [DY] 1-35 * Exemple 4, formulation B *; | [PX]WO9640044 (PROCTER &GAMBLE) [PX] 1-35 * example 10; claims 1-8 *; | [PX]WO9636308 (PROCTER & GAMBLE) [PX] 1-35 * examples I-V,,; claims 1-6 * | [Y] - "Sheer Leg Make-up", HOUSEHOLD & PERSONAL PRODUCTS INDUSTRY, (199107), vol. 28, no. 7, page 18, XP002030730 [Y] 1-35 * page 18 * |