EP0816927 - Electrophotographic photosensitive member, and apparatus and process cartridge provided with the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.11.2001 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/03] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | ||
Former [1998/02] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Anayama, Hideki Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Yoshida, Akira Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1998/02] | Representative(s) | Santarelli Tour Trinity 1 bis Esplanade de la Défense 92035 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/51] | Rinuy, Santarelli 14, avenue de la Grande Armée, B.P. 237 75822 Paris Cédex 17 / FR | ||
Former [1998/02] | Rinuy, Santarelli 14, avenue de la Grande Armée 75017 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 97401574.5 | 03.07.1997 | [1998/02] | Priority number, date | JP19960175132 | 04.07.1996 Original published format: JP 17513296 | JP19960175136 | 04.07.1996 Original published format: JP 17513696 | [1998/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0816927 | Date: | 07.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0816927 | Date: | 17.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G03G5/05 | [1998/02] | CPC: |
G03G5/14773 (EP,US);
G03G5/14756 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1998/38] |
Former [1998/02] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Elektrophotographisches, lichtempfindliches Element, sowie ein Apparat und eine Prozesskassette damit ausgerüstet | [1998/02] | English: | Electrophotographic photosensitive member, and apparatus and process cartridge provided with the same | [1998/02] | French: | Elément photosensible électrophotographique, ainsi que l'appareil et la cartouche de traitement le comprenant | [1998/02] | Examination procedure | 03.06.1998 | Examination requested [1998/32] | 21.02.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.07.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 16.09.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.10.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 17.01.2001 | [2008/07] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3935154 (CAWLEY JOHN DUVAL) [A] 1 * column 13, line 7 - line 14; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0403662 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1 * claims 6-10 *; | [A]EP0538070 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,14,18 * claims 1,25,26 *; | [A]EP0552740 (MITA INDUSTRIAL CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1* claim 10 *; | [A]US5492786 (SUGIMURA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * claim 1 * |