EP0818200 - Use of polysaccharide to stimulate desquamation of the skin and compositions containing it [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/03] | For all designated states L'OREAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pineau, Nathalie 19, Rue du Bas des Sables 86000 Poitiers / FR | 02 /
Breton, Lionel 111, Rue Satory 78000 Versailles / FR | [1998/03] | Representative(s) | Tezier Herman, Béatrice L'Oréal D.I.P.I. 6 rue Bertrand Sincholle 92585 Clichy Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/03] | Tezier Herman, Béatrice L'OREAL, Département Propriété Industrielle, 90, rue du Gal Roguet 92583 Clichy Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 97401606.5 | 04.07.1997 | [1998/03] | Priority number, date | FR19960008616 | 10.07.1996 Original published format: FR 9608616 | [1998/03] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0818200 | Date: | 14.01.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0818200 | Date: | 10.04.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/715 | [1998/03] | CPC: |
A61K8/60 (EP,US);
A61K8/73 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61Q19/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/03] | Title | German: | Verwendung eines Polysaccharids in einer Zusammensetzung zur Förderung der Abschuppung der Haut und Zusammensetzung, die ein Polysaccharid enthält. | [2002/15] | English: | Use of polysaccharide to stimulate desquamation of the skin and compositions containing it | [1998/03] | French: | Utilisation d'un polyholoside dans une composition destinée à favoriser la desquamation de la peau, et composition le comprenant | [1998/03] |
Former [1998/03] | Zusammensetzungen mit einem Polysaccharid und ihre Verwendung zur Förderung des Abschuppen der Haut | Examination procedure | 14.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/37] | 05.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 17.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 17.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.02.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.04.2002 | FI | 10.04.2002 | GR | 10.04.2002 | IE | 10.04.2002 | NL | 10.04.2002 | LU | 04.07.2002 | DK | 10.07.2002 | PT | 10.07.2002 | SE | 10.07.2002 | BE | 31.07.2002 | CH | 31.07.2002 | LI | 31.07.2002 | [2013/22] |
Former [2004/40] | AT | 10.04.2002 | |
FI | 10.04.2002 | ||
GR | 10.04.2002 | ||
IE | 10.04.2002 | ||
NL | 10.04.2002 | ||
LU | 04.07.2002 | ||
DK | 10.07.2002 | ||
PT | 10.07.2002 | ||
SE | 10.07.2002 | ||
BE | 31.07.2002 | ||
CH | 31.07.2002 | ||
LI | 31.07.2002 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 10.04.2002 | |
GR | 10.04.2002 | ||
IE | 10.04.2002 | ||
NL | 10.04.2002 | ||
LU | 04.07.2002 | ||
DK | 10.07.2002 | ||
PT | 10.07.2002 | ||
SE | 10.07.2002 | ||
BE | 31.07.2002 | ||
CH | 31.07.2002 | ||
LI | 31.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/51] | AT | 10.04.2002 | |
GR | 10.04.2002 | ||
IE | 10.04.2002 | ||
NL | 10.04.2002 | ||
DK | 10.07.2002 | ||
PT | 10.07.2002 | ||
SE | 10.07.2002 | ||
BE | 31.07.2002 | ||
CH | 31.07.2002 | ||
LI | 31.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 10.04.2002 | |
GR | 10.04.2002 | ||
IE | 10.04.2002 | ||
NL | 10.04.2002 | ||
DK | 10.07.2002 | ||
PT | 10.07.2002 | ||
SE | 10.07.2002 | ||
CH | 31.07.2002 | ||
LI | 31.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/39] | AT | 10.04.2002 | |
GR | 10.04.2002 | ||
IE | 10.04.2002 | ||
NL | 10.04.2002 | ||
PT | 10.07.2002 | ||
SE | 10.07.2002 | ||
CH | 31.07.2002 | ||
LI | 31.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/30] | AT | 10.04.2002 | |
GR | 10.04.2002 | ||
IE | 10.04.2002 | ||
NL | 10.04.2002 | ||
PT | 10.07.2002 | ||
SE | 10.07.2002 | ||
DE | 11.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/21] | AT | 10.04.2002 | |
GR | 10.04.2002 | ||
IE | 10.04.2002 | ||
NL | 10.04.2002 | ||
PT | 10.07.2002 | ||
SE | 10.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/19] | AT | 10.04.2002 | |
GR | 10.04.2002 | ||
IE | 10.04.2002 | ||
NL | 10.04.2002 | ||
SE | 10.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/17] | AT | 10.04.2002 | |
IE | 10.04.2002 | ||
NL | 10.04.2002 | ||
SE | 10.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/10] | AT | 10.04.2002 | |
NL | 10.04.2002 | ||
SE | 10.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | NL | 10.04.2002 | |
SE | 10.07.2002 | ||
Former [2002/42] | SE | 10.07.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4221753 (PLANTAMED ARZNEIMITTEL GMBH [DE]); | [A] - H. WAGNER ET AL., "Immunstimulierend wirkende Polysaccharide (Heteroglykane) aus höheren Pflanzen.", DRUG RESEARCH, (1985), vol. 35, no. 7, pages 1069 - 1075, XP000646167 |