EP0820899 - Vehicle headlight beam adjustment with discrete reference values and associated selector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.01.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.02.2006 [2006/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALEO VISION 34, rue Saint-André 93000 Bobigny / FR | [1998/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Metayer, Guy 50, rue des Carrières 92150 Suresnes / FR | 02 /
Roullet, Sylvain 11, rue Michelet 94500 Champigny Sur Marne / FR | [1998/05] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2004/50] |
Former [1998/05] | Le Forestier, Eric, et al Cabinet Regimbeau, 26, avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 97401748.5 | 21.07.1997 | [1998/05] | Priority number, date | FR19960009165 | 22.07.1996 Original published format: FR 9609165 | [1998/05] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0820899 | Date: | 28.01.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B60Q1/076 | [1998/05] | CPC: |
B60Q1/076 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, GB, IT, LI [1998/41] |
Former [1998/05] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Lichtbündeleinstellung für Kraftfahrzeugscheinwerfer mit diskreten Sollwerten und zugehörigem Wahlschalter | [1998/05] | English: | Vehicle headlight beam adjustment with discrete reference values and associated selector | [1998/05] | French: | Dispositif correcteur de l'orientation d'un faisceau de projecteur de véhicule automobile en fonction de consignes discretes, et sélecteur associé | [1998/05] | Examination procedure | deleted | Application refused, date of legal effect [2004/34] | 20.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/38] | 04.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 13.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2001/21] | 15.12.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2004/34] | 25.12.2000 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2001/21] | 18.08.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/08] | 21.09.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2006/08] | Appeal following examination | 12.04.2001 | Appeal received No. T0785/01 | 12.04.2001 | Statement of grounds filed | 18.02.2002 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2002/08] | 19.08.2003 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2003/34] | 04.09.2003 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2003/36] | 14.11.2003 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2003/46] | 22.01.2004 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2004/04] | 20.02.2004 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2005 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2670727 (ROBERT BOSCH GMBH) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]FR2384654 (CIBIE PROJECTEURS) [A] 1 * figures 3,5; claim 1 * |