EP0823511 - Guardrail for roads [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.04.2004 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.05.2004 [2004/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Société de Diffusion Lorraine- SODILOR Rue du Champs de Mars 57200 Sarreguemines / FR | [1998/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Halb, Jacques 8 rue des Myosotis 57200 Sarreguemines / FR | 02 /
Hener, Jean-Claude 3 rue des Saules 67260 Keskastel / FR | 03 /
Roustit, Patrick 2 Grand Rue Diedeng 57905 Sarreinsming / FR | 04 /
Chuiton, Jean-Marc La Basse Beloriére 44850 Le Cellier / FR | [1998/10] |
Former [1998/07] | 01 /
Halb, Jacques 8 rue des Myosotis 57200 Sarreguemines / FR | ||
02 /
Hener, Jean-Claude 38 rue de la Libération 67260 Keskastel / FR | |||
03 /
Roustit, Patrick 2 Grand Rue Diedeng 57905 Sarreinsming / FR | |||
04 /
Chuiton, Jean-Marc La Basse Beloriére 44850 Le Cellier / FR | Representative(s) | Leszczynski, André Cabinet Nony 3, rue de Penthièvre 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/07] | Leszczynski, André NONY & ASSOCIES 29, rue Cambacérès 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 97401871.5 | 04.08.1997 | [1998/07] | Priority number, date | FR19960009873 | 05.08.1996 Original published format: FR 9609873 | [1998/07] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0823511 | Date: | 11.02.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | E01F15/04 | [1998/07] | CPC: |
E01F15/0453 (EP);
E01F15/043 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/07] | Title | German: | Leitplanken für Strassenverkehr | [1998/07] | English: | Guardrail for roads | [1998/07] | French: | Barrière de sécurité pour voie de circulation | [1998/07] | Examination procedure | 29.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/39] | 28.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/21] | 22.12.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2004/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]FR2208418 (FORNELLS) [X] 1-6,17,20,23 * page 5, line 20 - page 10, line 18; figure - * [A] 7,8,18; | [DXA]EP0094306 (SOCIB) [DX] 1-5,11-13,20 * page 3, line 14 - page 6, line 10; figure - * [A] 16,21; | [A]EP0442249 (SINTERPLAST) [A] 1,5,9,10 * column 3, line 26 - line 49; figures 1,3 *; | [A]FR2714405 (J. MAILLET) [A] 1,9,10 * the whole document *; | [A]BE723941 (R. LEEMANS) |