Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0823511
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
02.04.2004 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 19.05.2004 [2004/21] |
18.12.2003 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
31.07.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.06.2003 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
09.05.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
18.04.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
11.12.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
18.09.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
12.09.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
05.08.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
28.03.2002 |
First examination report |
|
26.03.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
14.08.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
14.08.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
04.08.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
04.09.1998 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 21.10.1998 [1998/43] |
07.08.1998 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 23.09.1998 [1998/39] |
16.01.1998 |
Change - inventor |
published on 04.03.1998 [1998/10] |
24.12.1997 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 11.02.1998 [1998/07] |