EP0827771 - Process for separating gaseous mixtures containing oxygen and nitrogen [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.11.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.01.2003 [2003/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'air Liquide, S.A. à Directoire et Conseil de Surveillance pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/17] | For all designated states L'air Liquide, S.A. à Directoire et Conseil de Surveillance pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [1998/11] | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Labasque, Jacques 67 rue Jean de la Fontaine 78000 Versailles / FR | 02 /
Moreau, Serge 22 rue du Général Exelmas 78140 Velizy-Villacoublay / FR | 03 /
Rouge, Dominique 108 avenue Pierre Brossolette 92240 Malakoff / FR | [1998/11] | Representative(s) | Pittis, Olivier, et al L'Air Liquide, S.A. Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/19] | Pittis, Olivier, et al L'Air Liquide, S.A., Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle, 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [1998/11] | Le Moenner, Gabriel, et al L'AIR LIQUIDE S.A., Service Propriété Industrielle, 75, quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 97401888.9 | 06.08.1997 | [1998/11] | Priority number, date | FR19960010905 | 06.09.1996 Original published format: FR 9610905 | [1998/11] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0827771 | Date: | 11.03.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/04, B01D53/047, B01J20/18, C01B13/02 | [1998/11] | CPC: |
B01D53/047 (EP,US);
B01J20/186 (EP,US);
C01B13/027 (EP,US);
C01B21/0466 (EP,US);
B01D2253/108 (EP,US);
B01D2253/30 (EP,US);
B01D2256/12 (EP,US);
B01D2257/102 (EP,US);
B01D2259/40079 (EP,US);
B01D2259/40081 (EP,US);
B01D2259/4533 (EP,US);
B01D53/0476 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT, NL, SE [1998/48] |
Former [1998/11] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Trennung von Gasmischungen die Sauerstoff und Stickstoff enthalten | [1998/11] | English: | Process for separating gaseous mixtures containing oxygen and nitrogen | [1998/11] | French: | Procédé pour la séparation de mélanges gazeux contenant de l'oxygène et de l'azote | [1998/11] | Examination procedure | 11.09.1998 | Examination requested [1998/46] | 15.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5529610 (WATSON CHARLES F [US], et al) [X] 1-19 * column W *; | [AD]US5203887 (TOUSSAINT LEE J [US]) [AD] 1-19 * column W *; | [A]EP0374631 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [A]JPS62148304 ; | [A]JPS634824 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19871210), vol. 011, no. 379, Database accession no. (C - 463), & JP62148304 A 19870702 (NIPPON SANSO KK) [A] 1-19 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880610), vol. 012, no. 202, Database accession no. (C - 503), & JP63004824 A 19880109 (TOSOH CORP) [A] 1,10-12 * abstract * |