EP0829658 - Driving belt and method of fabrication thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/12] | Method of fabrication of a drive belt and belt obtained therefrom | ||
[2002/32] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.12.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.01.2004 [2004/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUTCHINSON 2, rue Balzac 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/05] | For all designated states HUTCHINSON 2 rue Balzac 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1998/12] | For all designated states HUTCHINSON 2 rue Balzac F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Berthelier, Marc 15 rue des Bono 37270 Athée S/Cher / FR | [1998/12] | Representative(s) | Jacquard, Philippe Jean-Luc, et al Cabinet ORES 36, rue de St Pétersbourg 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/12] | Jacquard, Philippe Jean-Luc, et al CABINET ORES, 6, Avenue de Messine 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 97401904.4 | 08.08.1997 | [1998/12] | Priority number, date | FR19960011018 | 10.09.1996 Original published format: FR 9611018 | [1998/12] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0829658 | Date: | 18.03.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0829658 | Date: | 29.01.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F16G5/20, B29D29/10 | [1998/12] | CPC: |
B29D29/103 (EP,US);
F16G5/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1998/49] |
Former [1998/12] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Treibriemen und der dazugehörige Herstellungsprozess | [2002/32] | English: | Driving belt and method of fabrication thereof | [2002/32] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'une courroie de transmission et courroie obtenue par ce procédé | [1998/12] |
Former [1998/12] | Herstellungsverfahren eines Treibriemens und dadurch hergestellter Riemen | ||
Former [1998/12] | Method of fabrication of a drive belt and belt obtained therefrom | Examination procedure | 28.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/32] | 15.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 28.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US4931118 (KITAHAMA KOJI [JP], et al) [Y] 1,5,6 * column 4, line 7 - line 53; figures 1-8 * [A] 11; | [Y]JPS62113940 ; | [Y]JPH07280040 ; | [Y]JPH07280040 (MITSUBOSHI BELTING LTD) [Y] 1,5 * figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP0429299 (MITSUBOSHI BELTING LTD [JP]) [A] 1,4-6,8,9,12 * column 8, line 28 - column 11, line 49; figures 1-5 *; | [A]EP0694710 (MITSUBOSHI BELTING LTD [JP]) [A] 4 * column 8, line 3 - line 26; figure 5 *; | [A]EP0317316 (GATES RUBBER CO [US]) [A] 4 * column 3, line 45 - line 50; figures 2,3 *; | [AD]EP0642886 (MITSUBOSHI BELTING LTD [JP]) [AD] 5 * column 7, line 49 - column 8, line 26; figures 3,4 *; | [AD]EP0633408 (MITSUBOSHI BELTING LTD [JP]) [AD] 5 * column 6, line 27 - line 31; figures 1,4 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19871030), vol. 011, no. 333, Database accession no. (M - 637), & JP62113940 A 19870525 (BANDO CHEM IND LTD) [Y] 1,5,6 * abstract * | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 96, no. 01, Database accession no. 96-003759, XP002032097 & JPH07280040 A 19951027 (MITSUBOSHI BELTING) [Y] 1,5 * abstract * | by applicant | EP0642886 | EP0633408 |