EP0832571 - Suit with support [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.11.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.01.2002 [2002/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boivin, William 40, avenue Guynemer 94100 St. Maur / FR | [1998/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/14] | Application number, filing date | 97402037.2 | 02.09.1997 | [1998/14] | Priority number, date | deleted | [1999/01] |
Former [1998/14] | FR19960011697 | 26.09.1996 | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0832571 | Date: | 01.04.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A41D13/02, A41D13/00 | [1998/14] | CPC: |
A41D13/0525 (EP);
A41D1/086 (EP);
A41D13/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, GB, IT, NL [1998/51] |
Former [1998/14] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Anzug mit Stütze | [1998/14] | English: | Suit with support | [1998/14] | French: | Combinaison de maintien | [1998/14] | Examination procedure | 30.05.1998 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Priority | 02.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 01 | 22.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/09] | 03.04.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/02] | 11.07.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 18.11.1998 | M01   Fee paid on   22.12.1998 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2000 | 04   M06   Not yet paid | 30.09.2001 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2709369 (INST NAT SANTE RECH MED) [A] 1,5 * page 9, line 18 - line 22 ** figures 1-4 *; | [A]DE2850692 (SILVY TRICOT S A S DI SILVANA) [A] 1-10 * page 4, line 21 - page 5, line 20 * * page 10, line 6 - line 15 * * figures 1-3,7-9 *; | [A]US4926502 (MIYAMURA TETSUO [JP]) [A] 1,5 * the whole document *; | [A]US5007412 (DEWALL TERRY L [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document * |