EP0835967 - Building facade including elements of reduced weight [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.07.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.08.2004 [2004/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MONOPANEL S.A. Rue Géo Lufbéry 02300 Chauny / FR | For all designated states Atofina 4/8 Cours Michelet 92800 Puteaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/34] | For all designated states Monopanel S.A. Rue Géo Lufbéry 02300 Chauny / FR | ||
For all designated states Atofina 4/8 Cours Michelet 92800 Puteaux / FR | |||
Former [1998/16] | For all designated states Monopanel S.A. Rue Géo Lufbéry 02300 Chauny / FR | ||
For all designated states ELF ATOCHEM S.A. 4 & 8, Cours Michelet, La Défense 10 92800 Puteaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ginet, Marc 10, Avenue du Plateau 94100 Saint Maur / FR | 02 /
Le Feron de Longcamp, Michel Ferme de Vauville, Chemin du Bout Millet 14920 Mathieu / FR | [1998/16] | Representative(s) | Texier, Christian, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/16] | Texier, Christian, et al Cabinet Regimbeau, 26, Avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 97402339.2 | 06.10.1997 | [1998/16] | Priority number, date | FR19960012261 | 08.10.1996 Original published format: FR 9612261 | [1998/16] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0835967 | Date: | 15.04.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | E04B2/92 | [1998/16] | CPC: |
E04B2/92 (EP,US);
E04F13/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/16] | Title | German: | Gebäudefassade mit Elementen von geringem Gewicht | [1998/16] | English: | Building facade including elements of reduced weight | [1998/16] | French: | Façade de bâtiment comprenant des éléments de poids réduits | [1998/16] | Examination procedure | 12.10.1998 | Examination requested [1998/50] | 07.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.02.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/34] | 19.03.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2075338 (DAVISON ROBERT L) [A] 1,3,4,16,17 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2723387 (NOUAILHAC FELIX [FR]) [A] 1,4,5,16,17 * the whole document * |