EP0838690 - Method of manufacturing a magnetoresistive magnetic sensor and transducer obtained [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.09.2001 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.11.2001 [2001/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 31/33, rue de la Fédération 75015 Paris Cédex 15 / FR | [1998/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fedeli, Jean-Marc 54 rue du Bois Mentel 38400 Saint Martin D'Heres / FR | [1998/18] | Representative(s) | Signore, Robert, et al c/o BREVATOME 3, rue du Docteur Lanceraux 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/18] | Signore, Robert, et al c/o BREVATOME 25, rue de Ponthieu 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 97402478.8 | 20.10.1997 | [1998/18] | Priority number, date | FR19960012812 | 22.10.1996 Original published format: FR 9612812 | [1998/18] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0838690 | Date: | 29.04.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/09 | [1998/18] | CPC: |
G01R33/09 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1999/02] |
Former [1998/18] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Herstellungsverfahren für einen magnetoresistiven Magnetfeldsensor sowie mit diesem Verfahren hergestellter Sensor | [1998/18] | English: | Method of manufacturing a magnetoresistive magnetic sensor and transducer obtained | [1998/18] | French: | Procédé de réalistation d'un capteur magnétique magnétorésistif et capteur obtenu par ce procédé | [1998/18] | Examination procedure | 09.10.1998 | Examination requested [1998/50] | 03.05.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/46] | 11.06.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2001/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2000 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US5260653 (SMITH NEIL [US], et al); | [A]EP0600549 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]); | [A]US5483735 (POSTMA LAMBERTUS [NL], et al); |