EP0839872 - Curable polymer having reactive silicon-containing functional groups [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2004 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.03.2004 [2004/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KANEKA CORPORATION 2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8288 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/11] | For all designated states KANEKA CORPORATION 2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8288 / JP | ||
Former [1998/19] | For all designated states KANEKA CORPORATION 2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chiba, Makoto 6-512, Maikodai 6-chome, Tarumi-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 655 / JP | 02 /
Okamoto, Toshihiko 31-17, Shioyacho 6-chome, Tarumi-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 655 / JP | 03 /
Sakaguchi, Masashi 109 Jyonehaitsu, Mizonokuchi 2-chome Kakogawa-shi, Hyogo 675 / JP | 04 /
Takase, Jyunji 5-20, Nishiakashicho 5-chome Akashi-shi, Hyogo 673 / JP | [1998/19] | Representative(s) | Hubert, Philippe, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/19] | Hubert, Philippe, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 97402576.9 | 30.10.1997 | [1998/19] | Priority number, date | JP19960291536 | 01.11.1996 Original published format: JP 29153696 | JP19960293043 | 05.11.1996 Original published format: JP 29304396 | JP19960293044 | 05.11.1996 Original published format: JP 29304496 | JP19960308870 | 20.11.1996 Original published format: JP 30887096 | [1998/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0839872 | Date: | 06.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0839872 | Date: | 29.07.1998 | [1998/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0839872 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C08L101/10 | [1998/19] | CPC: |
C08L101/10 (EP,US);
C08K3/22 (EP,US);
C08K5/57 (EP,US);
C08L21/00 (EP,US);
C08L23/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB [1999/15] |
Former [1998/19] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vernetzbares Polymer mit reaktiven, Silicium enthaltenden funktionellen Gruppen | [1998/19] | English: | Curable polymer having reactive silicon-containing functional groups | [1998/19] | French: | Polymère réticulable à fonctions réactives contenant du silicium | [1998/19] | Examination procedure | 15.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/11] | 18.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH03111432 ; | [Y]JPH0733984 ; | [Y]EP0268780 (KANEGAFUCHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [Y] 1-13 * page 1, line 1 - line 6 * * page 3, line 24 * * page 8, line 39 - line 43 * * page 8, line 53 ** page 9, line 25 - line 37 *; | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 91, no. 25, Database accession no. 91-182394, XP002066487 & JPH03111432 A 19910513 (KANEGAFUCHI) [Y] 1-13 * abstract * | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 95, no. 15, Database accession no. 95-110806, XP002066488 & JPH0733984 A 19950203 (SHIN-ETSU) [Y] 1-13 * abstract * |