EP0847919 - Thermoinsulating covering for spacecraft and spacecraft comprising such covering [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.11.2000 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.01.2001 [2001/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AEROSPATIALE Société Nationale Industrielle 37, Boulevard de Montmorency 75781 Paris Cédex 16 / FR | [1998/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gioanni, Pierre 44, Avenue Docteur Capony 06110 Le Cannet / FR | [1998/25] | Representative(s) | Dubois-Chabert, Guy, et al BREVALEX 3, rue du Docteur Lanceraux 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/25] | Dubois-Chabert, Guy, et al Société de Protection des Inventions 25, rue de Ponthieu 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 97402887.0 | 01.12.1997 | [1998/25] | Priority number, date | FR19960014865 | 04.12.1996 Original published format: FR 9614865 | [1998/25] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0847919 | Date: | 17.06.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B64G1/58, B64G1/64 | [1998/25] | CPC: |
B64G1/58 (EP);
B64G1/64 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT, NL [1999/09] |
Former [1998/25] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Wärmeisolierende Abdeckung für Raumfahrzeug und Raumfahrzeug mit einer solchen Abdeckung | [1998/25] | English: | Thermoinsulating covering for spacecraft and spacecraft comprising such covering | [1998/25] | French: | Couverture thermiquement isolante pour engin spatial et engin spatial comprenant une telle couverture | [1998/25] | Examination procedure | 26.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/04] | 01.07.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/02] | 25.07.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2001/02] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1999 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4344591 (JACKSON LIAM R) [A] 1,7 * column 3, line 4 - column 6, line 26; figures 1-7 *; | [A]EP0214893 (CENTRE NAT ETD SPATIALES [FR]) [A] 1,7 * column 5, line 38 - column 10, line 8; figures 1-12 *; | [A]US5236151 (HAGLE MICHAEL P [US], et al) [A] 1,7 * column 3, line 17 - column 4, line 47; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE4340002 (DEUTSCHE AEROSPACE [DE]) [A] 1,7 * column 2, line 6 - line 28 ** column 2, line 51 - column 4, line 22; figures 1-5 * |