EP0846958 - Voltage step up circuit for magnetometric sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.12.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.01.2007 [2007/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, LIMITED 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/24] | For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, LIMITED 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Toyoda, Haruhisa Itami Works, Sumitomo Electric Industries Ltd. 1-1 Koyakita 1-chome, Itami-shi, Hyogo / JP | 02 /
Nagaishi, Tatsuoki Itami Works, Sumitomo Electric Industries Ltd. 1-1 Koyakita 1-chome, Itami-shi, Hyogo / JP | 03 /
Itozaki, Hideo Itami Works, Sumitomo Electric Industries Ltd. 1-1 Koyakita 1-chome, Itami-shi, Hyogo / JP | [1998/24] | Representative(s) | Ballot, Paul Denis Jacques, et al Cabinet Ballot 122, rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/24] | Ballot, Paul Denis Jacques, et al Cabinet Ballot-Schmit, 7, rue Le Sueur 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 97402956.3 | 05.12.1997 | [1998/24] | Priority number, date | JP19960342804 | 06.12.1996 Original published format: JP 34280496 | JP19960342805 | 06.12.1996 Original published format: JP 34280596 | [1998/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0846958 | Date: | 10.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0846958 | Date: | 15.11.2000 | [2000/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/035 | [1998/24] | CPC: |
G01R33/0356 (EP,US);
Y10S505/846 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FI, FR, GB, IT, NL [2001/31] |
Former [1998/24] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Spannungserhöhende Schaltung für magnetometrische Fühler | [1998/24] | English: | Voltage step up circuit for magnetometric sensor | [1998/24] | French: | Circuit élevateur de tension pour un capteur magnétométrique | [1998/24] | Examination procedure | 22.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/14] | 28.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/01] | 01.08.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO9118298 (VALTION TEKNILLINEN [FI]) [X] 1 * figure 1 *[A] 2-9; | [XA]US5387864 (GERSHENSON MEIR [US], et al) [X] 1,4 * column 2, line 27 - line 49 * [A] 2,3,5-9; | [XA]US5469057 (ROBINSON STEPHEN E [US]) [X] 1-4,6,7,9 * column 3, line 56 - column 4, line 6 * * column 9, line 63 - column 10, line 7 * * column 10, line 33 - line 35 * * figure 1 * [A] 5,8 |