EP0922405 - Cosmetic products dispenser for make-up [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2005 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 08.06.2005 [2005/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALOIS SAS Boîte Postale G - Le Prieuré 27110 Le Neubourg / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/39] | For all designated states VALOIS S.A.S. Boîte Postale G - Le Prieuré 27110 Le Neubourg / FR | ||
Former [1999/24] | For all designated states VALOIS S.A. Boîte Postale G - Le Prieuré 27110 Le Neubourg / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Garcia, Firmin 47, avenue Aristide Briand 27000 Evreux / FR | [1999/24] | Representative(s) | CAPRI 33, rue de Naples 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/24] | CAPRI SARL 94, avenue Mozart 75016 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 97403021.5 | 12.12.1997 | [1999/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0922405 | Date: | 16.06.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0922405 | Date: | 08.10.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A45D34/04, A46B11/00 | [1999/24] | CPC: |
A46B11/0058 (EP);
B05B11/0038 (US);
A45D34/042 (EP);
B05B11/0037 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL [2000/08] |
Former [1999/24] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Spender für kosmetische Produkte zum Schminken | [1999/24] | English: | Cosmetic products dispenser for make-up | [1999/24] | French: | Distributeur de produit cosmetique destine au maquillage | [1999/24] | Examination procedure | 13.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/06] | 28.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.10.2003 | NL | 08.10.2003 | LU | 12.12.2003 | BE | 31.12.2003 | CH | 31.12.2003 | LI | 31.12.2003 | MC | 31.12.2003 | [2005/23] |
Former [2005/02] | AT | 08.10.2003 | |
NL | 08.10.2003 | ||
BE | 31.12.2003 | ||
CH | 31.12.2003 | ||
LI | 31.12.2003 | ||
MC | 31.12.2003 | ||
Former [2005/01] | AT | 08.10.2003 | |
NL | 08.10.2003 | ||
BE | 31.12.2003 | ||
CH | 31.12.2003 | ||
LI | 31.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/51] | AT | 08.10.2003 | |
NL | 08.10.2003 | ||
CH | 31.12.2003 | ||
LI | 31.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/33] | AT | 08.10.2003 | |
NL | 08.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/31] | AT | 08.10.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2363299 (OREAL [FR]); | [A]DE3641389 (SCHWAN STABILO SCHWANHAEUSSER); | [A]DE3736095 (SCHWAN STABILO SCHWANHAEUSSER [DE]); | [A]EP0349416 (OREAL [FR]) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE9004068U (ROTRING-WERKE) [A] 1-5,7-13 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4105294 (MITSUBISHI PENCIL CO [JP]) [A] 1 * figure 2 *; | [DA]FR2685858 (CROSNIER DANIEL [FR], et al); | [A]EP0553021 (OREAL [FR]) [A] 1-3,7-11 * figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP0601192 (GARCIA RODRIGUEZ MANUEL [ES]); | [E]FR2753060 (VALOIS [FR]) [E] 1-13 * the whole document * | by applicant | FR2685858 |