EP0852314 - Circulating fluidized bed furnace with improved hearth [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.08.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.10.2002 [2002/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALSTOM Energy Systems S.A. 19-21, Avenue Morane Saulnier B.P. 74 78140 Velizy-Villacoublay / FR | [1999/24] |
Former [1998/28] | For all designated states GEC ALSTHOM Stein Industrie 19-21, Avenue Morane Saulnier B.P. 74 78140 Velizy-Villacoublay / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aubry, Jean 26 J, rue Paul Rivet 92350 Le Plessis Robinson / FR | [1998/28] | Representative(s) | Gosse, Michel, et al ALSTOM Technologies C.I.P.D. 23/25 Avenue Morane-Saulnier 92360 Meudon La Foret / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/47] | Gosse, Michel, et al ALSTOM FRANCE SA Département de Propriété Industrielle, 38, avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1998/28] | Fournier, Michel, et al c/o ALCATEL ALSTHOM, Département de Propriété Industrielle, 30, avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 97403176.7 | 30.12.1997 | [1998/28] | Priority number, date | FR19970000010 | 02.01.1997 Original published format: FR 9700010 | [1998/28] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0852314 | Date: | 08.07.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0852314 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F23C10/20, F23C10/04 | [2001/40] | CPC: |
F23C10/04 (EP);
F23C10/20 (EP);
F23C2206/101 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1998/28] | F23C11/02 | Designated contracting states | BE, ES, GB, GR, IE [1999/12] |
Former [1998/28] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Zirkulierende Wirbelschichtfeuerung mit verbessertem Herd | [1998/28] | English: | Circulating fluidized bed furnace with improved hearth | [1998/28] | French: | Foyer pour chaudière à LFC à sole améliorée | [1998/28] | Examination procedure | 08.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/10] | 17.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0349030 (METALLGESELLSCHAFT AG [DE]) [X] 1,2 * page 3, line 7 - line 47 * * page 6, line 6 - line 21; figures 1,3; example . * [A] 3; | [X]US4427364 (BERGKVIST JOERGEN [SE]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 67 - column 4, line 23; figures 4,5 *; | [A]US4817563 (BEISSWENGER HANS [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]US5168819 (SEMEDARD JEAN-CLAUDE [FR], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document * |