EP0789380 - Operating mechanism for a circuit breaker with a latch disengageable by a short circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2003 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.04.2003 [2003/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES SAS 89 boulevard Franklin Roosevelt 92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/35] | For all designated states Schneider Electric Industries SAS 89, boulevard Franklin Roosevelt 92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | ||
Former [2000/10] | For all designated states Schneider Electric Industries SA 89 boulevard Franklin Roosevelt 92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | ||
Former [1999/36] | For all designated states Schneider Electric Industries SA 40, avenue André Morizet 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [1997/33] | For all designated states SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC SA 40, avenue André Morizet 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nebon, Jean-Pierre Schneider Electric Sce. Propriété Industrielle 38050 Grenoble Cedex 09 / FR | 02 /
Grelier, Claude Schneider Electric, Sce. Propriété Industrielle 38050 Grenoble Cedex 09 / FR | 03 /
Rival, Marc Schneider Electric, Sce. Propriété Industrielle 38050 Grenoble Cedex 09 / FR | 04 /
Pinero, Eric Schneider Electric, Sce. Propriété Industrielle 38050 Grenoble Cedex 09 / FR | [1997/33] | Representative(s) | Ritzenthaler, Jacques, et al Schneider Electric SA Service Propriété Industrielle 38050 Grenoble Cédex 9 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/33] | Ritzenthaler, Jacques, et al Schneider Electric SA Service Propriété Industrielle 38050 Grenoble Cédex 9 / FR | Application number, filing date | 97410012.5 | 29.01.1997 | [1997/33] | Priority number, date | FR19960001661 | 06.02.1996 Original published format: FR 9601661 | [1997/33] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0789380 | Date: | 13.08.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0789380 | Date: | 10.04.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H01H77/10 | [1997/33] | CPC: |
H01H77/101 (EP,US);
H01H71/10 (KR);
H01H2071/507 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, GB, IT [1997/33] | Title | German: | Betätigungsmechanismus für einen Lastschalter mit durch einen kurzschlussentkuppelbare Verriegelung | [1997/33] | English: | Operating mechanism for a circuit breaker with a latch disengageable by a short circuit | [1997/33] | French: | Mécanisme de commande d'un disjoncteur à verrou débrayable sur un court-circuit | [1997/33] | Examination procedure | 31.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/14] | 26.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.08.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4906967 (WINTER JOHN M [US]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 49 - column 2, line 3 * * column 3, paragraph 3 - column 4, paragraph 1; figure - *; | [A]EP0466287 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 5 - column 4, line 52; figures 1,2 *; | [DA]US3873950 (GUSCHIN VLADISLAV YAKOVLEVICH) [DA] 1 * column 4, line 15 - line 60; figure 1 * |