EP0823608 - Process and installation to convey loads in a vacuum furnace and vacuum furnace with such an installation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.2002 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.02.2003 [2003/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fours Industriels B.M.I (Baudasse-Martin-Industries) Z.I. rue du Ruisseau, Saint-Quentin-Fallavier 38290 La Verpillère / FR | [1998/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jomain, Bernard 4, chemin de la Grange 69680 Chassieu / FR | [1998/07] | Representative(s) | Myon, Gérard Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet Lavoix 62, rue de Bonnel 69448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/07] | Myon, Gérard Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet Lavoix Lyon 62, rue de Bonnel 69448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR | Application number, filing date | 97420139.4 | 30.07.1997 | [1998/07] | Priority number, date | FR19960010084 | 06.08.1996 Original published format: FR 9610084 | [1998/07] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0823608 | Date: | 11.02.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0823608 | Date: | 19.09.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F27B9/14, F27B9/38, F27B9/20, F27B9/04 | [1998/07] | CPC: |
F27B9/042 (EP);
F27B9/14 (EP);
F27B9/201 (EP);
F27D3/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB [1998/43] |
Former [1998/07] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Transportieren von Einsatzgütern im Vakuumofen und Vakuumofen mit solcher Vorrichtung | [1998/07] | English: | Process and installation to convey loads in a vacuum furnace and vacuum furnace with such an installation | [1998/07] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de convoyage de charges à l'intérieur d'un four sous vide et four sous vide equipé d'un tel dispositif | [1998/07] | Examination procedure | 05.08.1998 | Examination requested [1998/40] | 25.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 11.07.2000 | Request for decision received: (all rights) | 14.07.2000 | Result of request for decision ((all rights)): Request granted | 31.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.06.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.09.2001 | [2003/09] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE963609 (WISTRA OFENBAUGESELLSCHAFT M B) [A] * figure -; claim - *; | [A]DE1919156 (BROCKMANN & BUNDT) [A] * figure -; claim - *; | [A]DE2904938 (KRAFT HAUSHERR KG) [A] * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US4441698 (LIMQUE FERDINAND [NL], et al); | [A]FR2534676 (EUROP COMPOSANTS ELECTRON [FR]); | [A]US4741695 (USHIJIMA SHIGEMI [JP]); | [A]DE3726802 (AICHELIN GMBH [DE]); | [A]EP0370916 (STEIN HEURTEY [FR]) [A] * figure -; claim - *; | [A]DE4140740 (LOI IND OFENANLAGEN [DE]) [A] * figure -; claim - * |