EP0856254 - Gripping device for a horseshoe [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.12.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2004 | Change - request for examination | published on 13.10.2004 [2004/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Watson, Curtis G. 3515 Dean Road Howell Michigan 48843 / US | For all designated states Mannarino, Andrew G. 3515 Dean Road Howell Michigan 48843 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/32] | For all designated states Watson, Curtis G. 3515 Dean Road Howell, Michigan 48843 / US | ||
For all designated states Mannarino, Andrew G. 3515 Dean Road Howell, Michigan 48843 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/32] | Representative(s) | Arbousse-Bastide, Jean-Claude Ph. Cabinet Arbousse Bastide BP 35 67044 Strasbourg Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/32] | Arbousse-Bastide, Jean-Claude Philippe Cabinet Arbousse Bastide, 5, place du Corbeau 67000 Strasbourg / FR | Application number, filing date | 97440014.5 | 03.02.1997 | [1998/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0856254 | Date: | 05.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A01L7/02 | [1998/32] | CPC: |
A01L7/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/32] | Title | German: | Greifvorrichtung für Hufeisen | [1998/32] | English: | Gripping device for a horseshoe | [1998/32] | French: | Dispositif de préhension pour fer de cheval | [1998/32] | Examination procedure | 06.02.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/03] | 20.05.1999 | Examination requested [2004/42] | 17.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2000/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 14.04.1999 | M01   Fee paid on   20.05.1999 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1999 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.06.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4420046 (CHOPLIN JEAN-PIERRE R [FR]) [X] 1,9 * column W *; | [XA]FR670989 (MÉZIÈRES) [X] 1,9 * the whole document * [A] 2-8,10-15; | [A]US4207947 (COPE RICK R [US], et al); | [A]EP0288403 (AMF SARL [FR]) |