EP0873025 - Method for providing at least one service to users of a telecommunication network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.2006 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.06.2006 [2006/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [1999/08] |
Former [1998/43] | For all designated states ALCATEL ALSTHOM COMPAGNIE GENERALE D'ELECTRICITE 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mercouroff, Nicolas 20 Bd Arago 75013 Paris / FR | 02 /
Couturier, Alban 14 rue Auguste Perret 75013 Paris / FR | [1998/43] | Representative(s) | Schätzle, Albin, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 70430 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/43] | Schätzle, Albin, Dipl.-Phys., et al Alcatel Alsthom Intellectual Property Department, Postfach 30 09 29 70449 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 97440036.8 | 14.04.1997 | [1998/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0873025 | Date: | 21.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0873025 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q3/00, H04M3/42 | [1998/43] | CPC: |
H04Q3/0029 (EP,US);
H04M3/4228 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1999/26] |
Former [1998/43] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Anbieten von wenigstens einem Dienst an Fernmeldenetzbenutzern | [1998/43] | English: | Method for providing at least one service to users of a telecommunication network | [1998/43] | French: | Procédé pour fournir au moins un service aux utilisateurs d'un réseau de télécommunication | [1998/43] | Examination procedure | 14.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/02] | 22.04.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CH, DK, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT | 20.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.05.1999 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 21.05.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 21.05.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 21.05.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.05.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.05.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 21.05.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 21.05.1999 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 21.05.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.06.2005 | BE | 15.06.2005 | SE | 15.09.2005 | [2006/13] |
Former [2005/50] | SE | 15.09.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9534175 (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA], et al) [A] 1-5,9,10,15,19-22 * abstract * * page 4, line 26 - page 7, line 15 *; | [A] - KUSAURA ET AL., "Distribution of service data to distributed SCPs in the advanced IN", GLOBECOM 95, SINGAPORE, (19951114), pages 1272 - 1276, XP000622992 [A] 1-5,8,19-22 * page 1272, column L, paragraph L - page 1273, column R, paragraph 5 * * page 1276 * | [A] - MARUYAMA, "Object-oriented switching software technology", IEICE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, TOKYO JP, (199210), vol. E75-B, no. 10, pages 957 - 968, XP000324829 [A] 1-7,18-22 * page 958, column R - page 961, column L, line 30 * * page 964, column L - page 968, column L, line 13 * | [A] - BALE, "Signalling in the intelligent network", BT TECHNOLOGY JOURNAL., IPSWICH GB, (199504), vol. 13, no. 2, pages 30 - 42, XP000500754 [A] 1,9,10,15,19,20,22 * page 32, column R, line 3 - page 39, column L, line 37 * | [A] - HIRANO ET AL., "Distributed control node architecture in the advanced intelligent network", XV INTERNATIONAL SWITCHING SYMPOSIUM, BERLIN DE, (19950423), pages 278 - 282, XP000495667 [A] 1-5,19-22 * page 278, column R, paragraph 3 - page 279, column R, paragraph L * | [A] - TIBBITTS, "CORBA: A common touch for distributed applications", DATA COMMUNICATIONS., NEW YORK US, (19950521), vol. 24, no. 7, pages 71 - 75, XP000506540 [A] 1,9,10,15,19,20,22 * the whole document * | [A] - MARSHALL ET AL., "The information services supermarket - an information network prototype", BT TECHNOLOGY JOURNAL, IPSWICH GB, (199504), vol. 13, no. 2, pages 132 - 142, XP000500765 |