EP0856296 - Method for the manufacture of dental reamers from nickel-titanium alloy [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/32] | Method for the manufacture of dental reamers from nickel-titanium alloy and dental reamers thus obtained | ||
[2005/05] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MICRO MEGA INTERNATIONAL MANUFACTURES (Société Anonyme) 5 rue du Tunnel 25000 Besançon / FR | [1998/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Euvrard, Hubert Chemin du Moulin Auxon-Dessus, 25870 Geneuille / FR | 02 /
Chevillot, Denis 25 rue d'Ecole 25480 Miserey Salines / FR | [1998/32] | Representative(s) | Poupon, Michel Cabinet Bleger-Rhein-Poupon L'Escurial - Technopole de Brabois 17, avenue de la Forêt de Haye 54519 Vandoeuvre-Les-Nancy Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | Poupon, Michel Cabinet Michel Poupon L'Escurial - Technopole de Brabois 17 Avenue de la Forêt de Haye 54519 Vandoeuvre-Les-Nancy Cedex / FR | ||
Former [1998/32] | Poupon, Michel Cabinet Michel Poupon, 3, rue Ferdinand Brunot, B.P. 421 88011 Epinal Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 97470025.4 | 03.11.1997 | [1998/32] | Priority number, date | FR19970001131 | 29.01.1997 Original published format: FR 9701131 | [1998/32] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0856296 | Date: | 05.08.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0856296 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61C5/02 | [1998/32] | CPC: |
A61C5/42 (EP,US);
A61C5/40 (KR);
A61C3/00 (KR);
B24B3/20 (KR);
B24B3/22 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1999/16] |
Former [1998/32] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von dentalen Aufbereitungsinstrumenten aus Nickel-Titan-Legierung | [2005/05] | English: | Method for the manufacture of dental reamers from nickel-titanium alloy | [2005/05] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication d'alésoirs dentaire en alliage nickel-titane | [2005/05] |
Former [1998/32] | Verfahren zur Herstellung von dentalen Aufbereitungsinstrumenten aus Nickel-Titan-Legierung und dadurch erhaltene dentale Aufbereitungsinstrumente | ||
Former [1998/32] | Method for the manufacture of dental reamers from nickel-titanium alloy and dental reamers thus obtained | ||
Former [1998/32] | Procédé pour la fabrication d'alésoirs dentaire en alliage nickel-titane et lésoirs dentaires ainsi obtenus | Examination procedure | 31.08.1998 | Examination requested [1998/45] | 09.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 25.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/24] | Request for further processing for: | 24.06.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 26.06.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.07.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1999 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   20.01.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 29.06.2005 | SE | 29.09.2005 | ES | 10.10.2005 | BE | 30.11.2005 | [2007/17] |
Former [2006/22] | NL | 29.06.2005 | |
SE | 29.09.2005 | ||
ES | 10.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | SE | 29.09.2005 | |
ES | 10.10.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 29.09.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]US5464362 (HEATH DEREK E [US], et al) [XD] 1,5 * column 2, line 18 - line 19 ** column 2, line 60 - line 62 * |