EP0786380 - Panel, especially for interior trims of vehicle doors with at least one locally aesthetic area [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.02.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.04.2002 [2002/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Visteon Systemes Interieurs Tour Europlaza, 20 Avenue André Prothin, La Defense 4 92927 La Defense Cedex / FR | [2001/04] |
Former [1999/26] | For all designated states PLASTIC OMNIUM AUTO INTERIEUR 19, Avenue Jules Carteret 69007 Lyon / FR | ||
Former [1997/31] | For all designated states REYDEL Société Anonyme 37 rue Jean-Baptiste Marquant F-59147 Gondecourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Duriez, Dominique 37 rue Jean-Baptiste Marquant 59147 Gondecourt / FR | [1997/31] | Representative(s) | Duthoit, Michel Georges André, et al Bureau Duthoit Legros Associés 96/98, Boulevard Carnot B.P. 105 59027 Lille Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/26] | Duthoit, Michel, et al Bureau Duthoit Legros Associés 19, Square Dutilleul BP 105 59027 Lille Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1997/31] | Duthoit, Michel Bureau Duthoit Legros Associés 19, Square Dutilleul BP 105 59027 Lille Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 97490002.9 | 21.01.1997 | [1997/31] | Priority number, date | FR19960001102 | 25.01.1996 Original published format: FR 9601102 | [1997/31] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0786380 | Date: | 30.07.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0786380 | Date: | 18.04.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B60R13/02, B29C45/14 | [1997/31] | CPC: |
B29C45/14811 (EP);
B29C45/14 (EP);
B60R13/02 (EP);
B29C2045/14909 (EP);
B29C2045/14934 (EP);
B29L2031/3041 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1997/31] | Title | German: | Paneel, insbesondere für Innenverkleidung von Kraftfahrzeugtüren mit mindestens einem lokalen ästhetischen Bereich | [2000/21] | English: | Panel, especially for interior trims of vehicle doors with at least one locally aesthetic area | [1997/31] | French: | Panneau, notamment destiné à l'habillage intérieur des portières de véhicules présentant au moins localement une zone d'aspect esthétique | [1997/31] |
Former [1997/31] | Paneel,insbesondere für Innenverkleidung von Kraftfahrzeugtüren mit mindestens einemlokalen aesthetischen Bereich | Examination procedure | 13.08.1997 | Examination requested [1997/41] | 12.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.08.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.01.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE4343240 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 1-6 * column 1, line 50 - column 2, line 44; figure 1 *; | [A]JPS6058821 ; | [A]JPS6058822 ; | [A]GB2271956 (TOYODA GOSEI KK [JP]) [A] 1,5 * figures 5-10 *; | [A]EP0601272 (SCHOELLER PLAST AG [CH]) [A] 1,5 * figures 1-4B *; | [A]WO9425248 (ATOMA INT INC [CA]) [A] 1,5 * figures 1-5 *; | [A]EP0639442 (ASAA INC [US]) [A] 1 * figures 1-2B * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850810), vol. 9, no. 194, Database accession no. (M - 403), & JP60058821 A 19850405 (DAINIPPON INSATSU) [A] 1,5 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850810), vol. 9, no. 194, Database accession no. (M - 403), & JP60058822 A 19850405 (DAINIPPON INSATSU) [A] 1,5 * abstract * |