Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0831040
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
19.04.2002 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 05.06.2002 [2002/23] |
27.04.2001 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 13.06.2001 [2001/24] |
12.03.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
05.12.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
05.12.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
21.10.2000 |
First examination report |
|
17.10.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
17.10.2000 |
Request for accelerated examination |
|
18.09.2000 |
Request for accelerated examination |
|
01.08.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
19.08.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
17.12.1998 |
Change - extension states |
|
23.10.1998 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 09.12.1998 [1998/50] |
09.04.1998 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 27.05.1998 [1998/22] |
06.02.1998 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 25.03.1998 [1998/13] |