EP0829429 - Cap for oil bottles and the like [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.05.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.06.2003 [2003/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BETAPACK, S.A. Poligono Industrial Oianzabaleta, 66-A, Barrio Ventas 20305 Irun / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2002/48] | For all designated states BETAPACK, S.A. Poligono Industrial Oianzabaleta, 66-A, Barrio Ventas 20305 Irun / ES | ||
Former [1998/12] | For all designated states Beplast, S.A. Bidasoa, 62 31780 Vera de Bidasoa (Navarra) / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Berroa Garcia, Javier Beplast, S.A., Bidasoa, 62 31780 Vera de Bidasoa (Navarra) / ES | [1998/12] | Representative(s) | Carpintero Lopez, Francisco Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Agustín de Foxá, 4-10 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [1998/12] | Carpintero Lopez, Francisco HERRERO & ASOCIADOS, S.L. Alcalá, 21 28014 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 97500053.0 | 19.03.1997 | [1998/12] | Priority number, date | ES19960002350U | 12.09.1996 Original published format: ES 9602350 U | ES19960002600U | 11.10.1996 Original published format: ES 9602600 U | [1998/12] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0829429 | Date: | 18.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0829429 | Date: | 26.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B65D41/48 | [1998/12] | CPC: |
B65D41/485 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, FR, PT [1998/12] | Title | German: | Kappe für Ölflaschen oder dergleichen | [1998/12] | English: | Cap for oil bottles and the like | [1998/12] | French: | Capuchon pour des bouteilles d'huile ou similaires | [1998/12] | Examination procedure | 25.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/31] | 18.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.10.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5207783 (BURTON GEORGE W) [X] 1 * claims 1,2 * * figures 1-3 * [Y] 2-6; | [Y]US4372456 (GUALA, PIERGIACOMO) [Y] 2-6 * figures 1-5 * * column 2, line 27 - line 44 *; | [A]WO9622233 (KERR GROUP INC) [A] 1,2 * figure 2 * |