Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.06.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.07.2002 [2002/30] |
04.03.2002 | Surcharge for renewal fee | |
18.02.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | |
07.09.2001 | First examination report | |
04.09.2001 | Examination report or reply | |
31.01.2001 | Renewal fee | |
28.01.2000 | Renewal fee | |
05.02.1999 | Renewal fee | |
20.11.1998 | Request for examination filed | published on 07.01.1999 [1999/01] |
29.05.1998 | Publication of search report | published on 15.07.1998 [1998/29] |
15.05.1998 | Change - classification | published on 01.07.1998 [1998/27] |
20.06.1997 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 06.08.1997 [1997/32] |