Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6039988 | 21.03.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US59503596 | 31.01.1996 | US12947698 | 04.08.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0787435 | Global Dossier | 15.07.1998 | A3 | EP0787435 | 06.08.1997 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US59503596 | 31.01.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5789008 | 04.08.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US59503596 | 31.01.1996 |