EP0787435 - Ice cream sandwich and method of making same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.06.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.07.2002 [2002/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MONTE, Woodrow C. 6411 South River Drive, 65 Tempe, AZ 85283 / US | [1997/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1997/32] | Representative(s) | McCarthy, Denis Alexis, et al MacLachlan & Donaldson Unit 10, 4075 Kingswood Road Citywest Business Campus Dublin D24 C56E / IE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/32] | McCarthy, Denis Alexis, et al MacLachlan & Donaldson 47 Merrion Square Dublin 2 / IE | Application number, filing date | 97650003.3 | 31.01.1997 | [1997/32] | Priority number, date | US19960595035 | 31.01.1996 Original published format: US 595035 | [1997/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0787435 | Date: | 06.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0787435 | Date: | 15.07.1998 | [1998/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A23G9/02, A23G9/28, A21D13/00, A21D13/08 | [1998/27] | CPC: |
A23G9/48 (EP,US);
A21D13/19 (EP,US);
A21D13/24 (EP,US);
A21D13/26 (EP,US);
A21D13/34 (EP,US);
A23G9/286 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/32] | A23G9/02, A23G9/28 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/32] | Title | German: | Speiseeissandwich und Herstellungsverfahren | [1997/32] | English: | Ice cream sandwich and method of making same | [1997/32] | French: | Sandwich de crème glacée et procédé de fabrication | [1997/32] | Examination procedure | 10.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/01] | 07.09.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/30] | 21.02.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2002 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CH411551 (BIG DRUM INC [US]) [X] 1-7 * page 1, line 1 - line 7 * * page 4, line 86 - line 89 * * page 4, line 56 - line 58 * * page 3, line 54 - page 4, line 13 *; | [X]GB2263615 (UNILEVER PLC [GB]) [X] 1,2,4 * page 6, line 30 - line 35; figures 1,4; claims 1-7,9,10 * * page 3, line 5 - line 26 *; | [X]US1404539 (NELSON CHRISTIAN K) [X] 1-5 * page 1, line 79 - line 89; figure 5 *; | [XY]US3547051 (KOMBEREC HAROLD L, et al) [X] 1-5,7 * column 2, line 51 - line 68 * * column 4, line 7 - line 46; figure 1 * [Y] 6; | [Y]US4401681 (DAHLE LELAND K [US]) [Y] 6 * column W *; | [X]US3481282 (REYNOLDS RICHARD ROLAND) [X] 1,4,5,7 * figures 9,11 * * column 5, line 33 - line 41 * * column 5, line 56 - line 67 *; | [A]EP0547551 (NAT STARCH CHEM INVEST [US]) [A] 1,6 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0217409 (INT FRIED ICE CREAM [US]); | [A]GB2226225 (PARADISE CUISINE LIMITED [GB]) |