EP0794280 - Finishing treatment method for nonwoven, a nonwoven fabric treated according to the method and a product containing the nonwoven fabric [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.07.2011 [2011/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Suominen Nonwovens Ltd. Suomisentie 11 29250 Nakkila / FI | [2007/17] |
Former [1997/37] | For all designated states J.W. SUOMINEN OY SF-29250 Nakkila / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hautojärvi, Joni Eskolantie 11 29250 Nakkila / FI | 02 /
Bergholm, Heikki Lehtisaarentie 6 G 00340 Helsinki / FI | [1997/37] | Representative(s) | Grew, Eva Regina, et al Oy Jalo Ant-Wuorinen Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 4-6-A 00120 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2005/06] | Grew, Eva Regina, et al Oy Jalo Ant-Wuorinen Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 4-6-A 00120 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [1997/37] | Haimelin, Jukka Ilmari, et al Oy Jalo Ant-Wuorinen Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 4-6 A 00120 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 97660009.8 | 05.02.1997 | [1997/37] | Priority number, date | FI19960000602 | 09.02.1996 Original published format: FI 960602 | [1997/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0794280 | Date: | 10.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0794280 | Date: | 15.04.1998 | [1998/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0794280 | Date: | 17.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | D06M15/647, D06M15/643, D06M23/16, D04H1/42 | [1998/16] | CPC: |
D04H1/4291 (EP);
A61L15/42 (EP);
D04H1/42 (EP);
D04H1/54 (EP);
D04H1/544 (EP);
D06M15/647 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1997/37] | D06M15/647, D06M15/643, D06M23/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/37] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Behandlung von Vliesstoffen, behandelte Vliesstoffe und Produkte mit diesen Vliesstoffen | [1997/37] | English: | Finishing treatment method for nonwoven, a nonwoven fabric treated according to the method and a product containing the nonwoven fabric | [1997/37] | French: | Procédé de traitement de non-tissés, non-tissé traité, et produit le contenant | [1997/37] | Examination procedure | 07.10.1998 | Examination requested [1998/49] | 25.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 15.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 17.10.2007 | FI | 17.10.2007 | NL | 17.10.2007 | SE | 17.01.2008 | GR | 18.01.2008 | ES | 28.01.2008 | LU | 05.02.2008 | MC | 28.02.2008 | IT | 29.02.2008 | PT | 17.03.2008 | [2011/27] |
Former [2010/28] | DK | 17.10.2007 | |
FI | 17.10.2007 | ||
NL | 17.10.2007 | ||
SE | 17.01.2008 | ||
GR | 18.01.2008 | ||
ES | 28.01.2008 | ||
LU | 05.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
PT | 17.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | DK | 17.10.2007 | |
FI | 17.10.2007 | ||
NL | 17.10.2007 | ||
SE | 17.01.2008 | ||
GR | 18.01.2008 | ||
ES | 28.01.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
PT | 17.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | DK | 17.10.2007 | |
NL | 17.10.2007 | ||
SE | 17.01.2008 | ||
ES | 28.01.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
PT | 17.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | DK | 17.10.2007 | |
NL | 17.10.2007 | ||
SE | 17.01.2008 | ||
ES | 28.01.2008 | ||
PT | 17.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | NL | 17.10.2007 | |
SE | 17.01.2008 | ||
ES | 28.01.2008 | ||
PT | 17.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | NL | 17.10.2007 | |
SE | 17.01.2008 | ||
ES | 28.01.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH04100981 ; | [A]US3769060 (HASEGAWA H, et al) [A] 1-7 * column 1, line 48 - column 2, line 68 * * column 5, line 24 - line 51 * * column 6, line 35 - line 42 ** example 20 *; | [AD]US4585449 (KARAMI HAMZEH [US]) [AD] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP0546580 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [AD] 1-7 * column 3, line 34 - column 6, line 36 * * figure 1 *; | [XPA]EP0748894 (SUOMINEN OY J W [FI]) [XP] 1-3,5-7 * page 2, line 49 - page 4, line 12 * * figures 1,2; claim - * [A] 4 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920724), vol. 016, no. 342, Database accession no. (C - 0966), & JP04100981 A 19920402 (KOREHOO:KK;OTHERS: 01) [A] 1 * abstract * |