EP0872591 - Method of coating cellulosic and lignocellulosic webs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.2006 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IDI-Head OY Nuutalantie 73 37720 Ritvala / FI | [1999/36] |
Former [1998/43] | For all designated states Dettling, Bernhard Lärchenweg 1 a D-77886 Lauf / DE | ||
For all designated states HJA-engineering Oy Nuutalantie 73 37720 Ritvala / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dettling, Bernhard Lärchenweg 1a 77886 Lauf / DE | 02 /
Ahonen, Heikki Nuutalantie 73 37720 Ritvala / FI | [2005/50] |
Former [1998/43] | 01 /
Dettling, Bernard Lärchenweg 1a 77886 Lauf / DE | ||
02 /
Ahonen, Heikki Nuutalantie 73 37720 Ritvala / FI | Representative(s) | Sundman, Patrik Christoffer, et al Seppo Laine Oy Itämerenkatu 3 B 00180 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [1998/43] | Sundman, Christoffer, et al Seppo Laine Oy, Itämerenkatu 3 B 00180 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 97660042.9 | 16.04.1997 | [1998/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0872591 | Date: | 21.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0872591 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | D21H23/30, // D21H19:74 | [1998/43] | CPC: |
D21H23/30 (EP,US);
D21H19/74 (EP,US);
D21H19/385 (EP,US);
Y10S162/09 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1998/43] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Beschichtung von zellulose- und lignozellulosehaltigen Bahnen | [1998/43] | English: | Method of coating cellulosic and lignocellulosic webs | [1998/43] | French: | Procédé d'enduction de feuilles cellulosiques et lignocellulosiques | [1998/43] | Examination procedure | 21.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/12] | 22.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 16.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/47] | Request for further processing for: | 16.01.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 16.01.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.02.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 14.12.2005 | ES | 25.03.2006 | [2006/45] |
Former [2006/34] | ES | 25.03.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3119708 (MUNCK ELLSWORTH G); | [A]EP0704753 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) |