EP0789438 - Gasinsulated cable section [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.02.2001 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Hochspannungstechnik AG Brown-Boveri-Strasse 5 8050 Zürich / CH | [2000/25] |
Former [1997/33] | For all designated states ASEA BROWN BOVERI AG Haselstrasse 16 5400 Baden / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moritz, Bertil Fägelviksvägen 60 72348 Västeras / SE | [1997/33] | Representative(s) | ABB Patent Attorneys C/o ABB Schweiz AG Intellectual Property CH-IP Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | ABB Patent Attorneys C/o ABB Schweiz AG Intellectual Property (CH-LC/IP), Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | ||
Former [2000/25] | ABB Patent Attorneys c/o ABB Business Services Ltd. (SLE-I) Haselstrasse 16/699 5401 Baden / CH | ||
Former [1997/33] | Kaiser, Helmut, Dr., et al Asea Brown Boveri AG Immaterialgüterrecht (TEI) Haselstrasse 16/699 5401 Baden / CH | Application number, filing date | 97810061.8 | 04.02.1997 | [1997/33] | Priority number, date | DE19961004480 | 08.02.1996 Original published format: DE 19604480 | [1997/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0789438 | Date: | 13.08.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0789438 | Date: | 07.01.1998 | [1998/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H02G5/06 | [1997/33] | CPC: |
H02G5/066 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, SE [1997/33] | Title | German: | Leitungsabschnitt einer gasisolierten Leitung | [1997/33] | English: | Gasinsulated cable section | [1997/33] | French: | Section de conduit à isolation par gaz | [1997/33] | Examination procedure | 09.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/11] | 11.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/12] | 20.10.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2001/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3315588 (HERBERT PRENZLAU) [A] 1,12 * abstract * * page 5, line 4 - line 8 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US3428741 (HELMUTH W.ZUCH) [A] 1 * figure 1 * * column 2, line 14 - line 30 *; | [A]FR2226767 (DELLE-ALSTHOM) [A] 1 * figure 2 *; | [A]US4110551 (ALAN H.COOKSON) [A] 1 * abstract * * figure 1 *; | [X]FR761000 (DEUTSCHE TELEPHONWERKE UND KABELINDUSTRIE) [X] 12,13 * page 1, line 33 - page 2, line 25 * * figures 1-3 *; | [X]GB688619 (J.DAY & CO.) [X] 12 * page 1, line 66 - line 89 * * figures 1-3 *; | [X]DE2163120 (VEB KABELWERK OBERSPREE) [X] 12 * page 1, line 20 - line 24 *; | [XY]DE1515427 (ASSOCIATED ELECTRICAL INDUSTRIES) [X] 12 * page 4, line 13 - page 5, line 17 * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 13; | [Y]DE2313749 (KUNSTSTOFFWERK HÖHN GMBH) [Y] 13 * column 4, line 7 - line 22 * * figure 1 * | by applicant | - EIDINGER A., "Aufbau, Einsatz und Erprobung von SF6-Rohrgaskabeln.", BROWN BOVERI MITT., (1976), vol. 61, no. 11, pages 688 - 694 |