EP0795498 - Transport device for bodies depositable on a conveyor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.04.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.2003 | Refusal of application | published on 21.05.2003 [2003/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/17] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/38] | For all designated states GRAPHA-HOLDING AG Seestrasse 41, Postfach 170 6052 Hergiswil / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maier, Wilhelm Neufeldstrasse 13b 5430 Wettingen / CH | 02 /
Rohner, Thomas Rosengartenstrasse 60 8037 Zürich / CG | [1997/38] | Representative(s) | Fischer, Michael, et al Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/17] | Fischer, Michael, et al Siemens AG, Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97810134.3 | 10.03.1997 | [1997/38] | Priority number, date | CH19960000685 | 15.03.1996 Original published format: CH 68596 | [1997/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0795498 | Date: | 17.09.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B65G47/54 | [1997/38] | CPC: |
B65G47/54 (EP);
B65G2207/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, DK, FR, IT, LI, NL [1997/38] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zum Transport von auf einer Förderbahn abstellbaren Körpern | [2002/30] | English: | Transport device for bodies depositable on a conveyor | [1997/38] | French: | Dispositif de transport pour corps déposables sur un convoyeur | [1997/38] |
Former [1997/38] | Einrichtung zum transport von auf einer Förderbahn abstellbaren Körpern | Examination procedure | 09.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/11] | 24.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 10.12.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2003/21] | 20.12.2002 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2003/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DD101637 (IZDATELSTVO IZVESTIA SOVETOV DEPUTATOV TRUDYASCHIKHSYA) [A] 1,5-7,9,10 * the whole document *; | [A]CH617635 (MASYC) [A] 1,4 * page 2, column R, line 27 - page 3, column R, line 11; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE8809686U (CC KONTROLL ANLAGEN) [A] 1-4,6 * page 6, line 10 - line 23; figures 1-4 *; | [A]DD105173 (BERGER ET AL.) [A] 1,2,4,6,7,9,10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0438667 (ALCATEL FACE) [A] 1,9,10 * column 4, line 12 - line 44; figure 1 * |