EP0835996 - Gas turbine with sequential combustion [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alstom 25, Avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | [2002/18] |
Former [2002/16] | For all designated states ALSTOM (Switzerland) Ltd Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5401 Baden / CH | ||
Former [2001/15] | For all designated states ALSTOM (Schweiz) AG Haselstrasse 16 5400 Baden / CH | ||
Former [2000/26] | For all designated states ABB ALSTOM POWER (Schweiz) AG 5401 Baden / CH | ||
Former [1998/16] | For all designated states Asea Brown Boveri AG Haselstrasse 16 5401 Baden / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marmilic, Robert Kirchweg 55 5415 Nussbaumen / CH | 02 /
Schulte-Werning, Burkhard, Dr. Berliner Strasse 38A 80805 München / DE | [1998/16] | Representative(s) | Pöpper, Evamaria, et al ALSTOM Technology Ltd CHTI Intellectual Property Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5401 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Pöpper, Evamaria, et al ALSTOM Technologie AG CHTI Intellectual Property Brown Boveri Strasse 7/688/5 5400 Baden / CH | ||
Former [2002/18] | Pöpper, Evamaria, Dr., et al ALSTOM (Schweiz) AG, Intellectual Property CHSP, Brown Boveri Strasse 7/699/5 5401 Baden / CH | ||
Former [2001/15] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2000/26] | Liebe, Rainer ABB Alstom Power (Schweiz) AG, Intellectual Property CHSP, c/o ABB Business Services Ltd, Haselstrasse 16/699 5401 Baden / CH | Application number, filing date | 97810692.0 | 22.09.1997 | [1998/16] | Priority number, date | DE1996141725 | 10.10.1996 Original published format: DE 19641725 | [1998/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0835996 | Date: | 15.04.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0835996 | Date: | 10.04.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F02C6/00, F01D9/04 | [1998/16] | CPC: |
F02C6/003 (EP,US);
F01D9/042 (EP,US);
F05D2260/201 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/01] |
Former [1998/16] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Gasturbine mit einer sequentiellen Verbrennung | [1998/16] | English: | Gas turbine with sequential combustion | [1998/16] | French: | Turbine à gaz avec combustion séquentielle | [1998/16] | Examination procedure | 05.10.1998 | Examination requested [1998/49] | 16.10.1998 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) IT | 09.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.09.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 15.12.1998 | IT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2071665 (GEN ELECTRIC) [Y] 3,5 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0590297 (ASEA BROWN BOVERI [CH]) [X] 1,2,4 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2293415 (HELLIWELL BRIAN JOHN [GB]) [A] 1-5* the whole document *; | [XY]DE19507763 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4 * the whole document * [Y] 3,5; | [A]US5557918 (CHYOU YAU-PIN [TW], et al) [A] 1-5 * figure - *; | [XP]US5647200 (ALTHAUS ROLF [CH]) [XP] 1,2,4 * the whole document * | Examination | EP0620362 | by applicant | EP0620362 | EP0669500 |