EP0835960 - Apparatus for profiling grinding wheels for reprofiling a rail head [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.09.2001 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.11.2001 [2001/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCHEUCHZER S.A. Avenue du Mont-d'Or, 7 CH-1007 Lausanne / CH | [1998/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bühler, Fritz Chemin des Clos, 81 1024 Ecublens / CH | [1998/16] | Representative(s) | Jörchel, Dietrich R.A. c/o BUGNION S.A. Case postale 375 1211 Genève 12 - Champel / CH | [1998/16] | Application number, filing date | 97810759.7 | 09.10.1997 | [1998/16] | Priority number, date | CH19960002482 | 11.10.1996 Original published format: CH 248296 | [1998/16] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0835960 | Date: | 15.04.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | E01B31/17 | [1998/16] | CPC: |
E01B31/17 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI [1999/01] |
Former [1998/16] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Abrichteinrichtung von Schleifscheiben zum Formschleifen von Schienenköpfen | [1998/16] | English: | Apparatus for profiling grinding wheels for reprofiling a rail head | [1998/16] | French: | Dispositif pour le profilage de meules périphériques de reprofilage de champignon de rail | [1998/16] | Examination procedure | 21.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/38] | 16.10.1998 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.01.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 03.05.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/46] | 07.06.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2001/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.11.1998 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.11.1998 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 19.11.1998 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 19.11.1998 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 19.11.1998 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 19.11.1998 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.11.1998 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.11.1998 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 19.11.1998 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 19.11.1998 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 19.11.1998 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2000 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5265379 (PANETTI) [A] 1,2,4-7 * column 4, line 22 - column 9, line 17; figures 1-14 *; | [A]DE4210710 (NILES WERKZEUGMASCHINEN) |