EP0858841 - Powder coating unit and powder coating installation with the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/34] | Powder coating unit, conveyor for such a unit and powder coating installation with the same | ||
[2003/11] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.11.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.01.2004 [2004/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiler, Daniel c/o SFB AG, St.Dionysstrasse 31 CH-8645 Jona / CH | [2003/19] |
Former [1998/34] | For all designated states Seiler, Daniel c/o SFB AG, St. Gallerstrasse 161 8645 Jona / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/34] | Application number, filing date | 97811015.3 | 22.12.1997 | [1998/34] | Priority number, date | CH19960003174 | 23.12.1996 Original published format: CH 317496 | CH19970000006 | 23.12.1996 Original published format: CH 697 | [1998/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0858841 | Date: | 19.08.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0858841 | Date: | 10.03.1999 | [1999/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B05B7/14, B05B13/02, B05B15/04, B05B5/08 | [1999/10] | CPC: |
B05B13/0221 (EP);
B05B14/10 (EP);
B05B14/20 (EP);
B05B14/30 (EP);
B05B5/084 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1998/34] | B05B7/14, B05B13/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1999/49] |
Former [1999/48] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, LI | ||
Former [1999/47] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1998/34] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Pulverbeschichtungsein sowie Beschichtungsanlage mit Pulverbeschichtungseinheit | [2003/11] | English: | Powder coating unit and powder coating installation with the same | [2003/11] | French: | Unité de revêtement par poudre et installation munie de cette unité | [2003/11] |
Former [1998/34] | Pulverbeschichtungseinheit, Transportband für eine derartige Pulverbeschichtungseinheit sowie Beschichtungsanlage mit Pulverbeschichtungseinheit | ||
Former [1998/34] | Powder coating unit, conveyor for such a unit and powder coating installation with the same | ||
Former [1998/34] | Unité de revêtement par poudre, bande transporteuse pour une telle unité et installation munie de cette unité | Examination procedure | 10.09.1999 | Examination requested [1999/48] | 13.09.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 05.01.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 17.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/02] | 07.08.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 20.10.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.1999 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.1999 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.1999 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1999 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   20.06.2000 | 31.12.2000 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   01.06.2001 | 31.12.2001 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   21.06.2002 | 31.12.2002 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS6138653 ; | [X]US5382450 (SALISBURY RICHARD [US]) [X] 1-3,5,10 * column 3, line 30 - column 4, line 8 * * column 6, line 24 - line 41 *; | [A]US4836137 (HEINE WERNER [DE], et al) [A] 1,3,4,8 * column 3, line 58 - column 5, line 55 *; | [A]GB1492092 (PLASTIC COATINGS LTD) [A] 6 * page 2, line 1 - line 3 * * page 3, line 43 - line 60 * * figures 1,4 *; | [A]US4495217 (SCHRUM TIMOTHY J [US]) [A] 6 * column 3, line 38 - line 48; figure 2 *; | [A]JPH07155652 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860708), vol. 010, no. 194, Database accession no. (C - 358), & JP61038653 A 19860224 (MATSUO SANGYO KK) [X] 1-3,5,9,10 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951031), vol. 095, no. 009, & JP07155652 A 19950620 (CHICHIBU ONODA CEMENT CORP) [A] 7 * abstract * | by applicant | EP0405164 |