EP0802039 - Injection moulding method for EVA-soles, having a treading surface with coloured sections [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Finproject - S.P.A. Via Manzoni 62010 Montecosaro (MC) / IT | [2001/46] |
Former [1997/43] | For all designated states Finproject - S.P.A. Via Piemonte, 39 Roma / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bisconti, Bruno Civitanova Marche (MC) Contrada Cavallino / IT | [1997/43] | Representative(s) | Baldi, Claudio Piazza Ghislieri, 3 60035 Jesi (Ancona) / IT | [1997/43] | Application number, filing date | 97830141.4 | 25.03.1997 | [1997/43] | Priority number, date | IT1996AN00009 | 19.04.1996 Original published format: IT AN960009 | [1997/43] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0802039 | Date: | 22.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0802039 | Date: | 08.04.1998 | [1998/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0802039 | Date: | 04.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B29D31/515 | [1997/43] | CPC: |
B29D35/144 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1997/43] | Extension states | AL | 10.04.1997 | LT | 10.04.1997 | LV | 10.04.1997 | RO | 10.04.1997 | SI | 10.04.1997 | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von spritzgegossenen und bereichsweise gefärbten EVA-Sohlen | [1997/43] | English: | Injection moulding method for EVA-soles, having a treading surface with coloured sections | [1997/43] | French: | Procédé de fabrication en moulage par injection de semelles EVA, avec des parties colorées prédéterminées | [1997/43] | Examination procedure | 06.10.1998 | Examination requested [1998/51] | 20.01.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.04.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.10.2001 | BE | 04.10.2001 | CH | 04.10.2001 | FI | 04.10.2001 | IT | 04.10.2001 | LI | 04.10.2001 | NL | 04.10.2001 | DK | 04.01.2002 | PT | 04.01.2002 | SE | 04.01.2002 | DE | 05.01.2002 | GR | 05.01.2002 | GB | 25.03.2002 | IE | 25.03.2002 | FR | 31.03.2002 | ES | 30.04.2002 | [2008/42] |
Former [2008/07] | AT | 04.10.2001 | |
BE | 04.10.2001 | ||
CH | 04.10.2001 | ||
FI | 04.10.2001 | ||
IT | 04.10.2001 | ||
LI | 04.10.2001 | ||
NL | 04.10.2001 | ||
DK | 04.01.2002 | ||
PT | 04.01.2002 | ||
SE | 04.01.2002 | ||
DE | 05.01.2002 | ||
GR | 05.01.2002 | ||
GB | 25.03.2002 | ||
IE | 25.03.2002 | ||
ES | 30.04.2002 | ||
Former [2004/51] | AT | 04.10.2001 | |
BE | 04.10.2001 | ||
CH | 04.10.2001 | ||
FI | 04.10.2001 | ||
LI | 04.10.2001 | ||
NL | 04.10.2001 | ||
DK | 04.01.2002 | ||
PT | 04.01.2002 | ||
SE | 04.01.2002 | ||
DE | 05.01.2002 | ||
GR | 05.01.2002 | ||
GB | 25.03.2002 | ||
IE | 25.03.2002 | ||
ES | 30.04.2002 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 04.10.2001 | |
BE | 04.10.2001 | ||
CH | 04.10.2001 | ||
FI | 04.10.2001 | ||
LI | 04.10.2001 | ||
NL | 04.10.2001 | ||
DK | 04.01.2002 | ||
PT | 04.01.2002 | ||
SE | 04.01.2002 | ||
DE | 05.01.2002 | ||
GB | 25.03.2002 | ||
IE | 25.03.2002 | ||
ES | 30.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 04.10.2001 | |
BE | 04.10.2001 | ||
CH | 04.10.2001 | ||
FI | 04.10.2001 | ||
LI | 04.10.2001 | ||
NL | 04.10.2001 | ||
DK | 04.01.2002 | ||
PT | 04.01.2002 | ||
SE | 04.01.2002 | ||
DE | 05.01.2002 | ||
GB | 25.03.2002 | ||
IE | 25.03.2002 | ||
Former [2003/17] | AT | 04.10.2001 | |
BE | 04.10.2001 | ||
CH | 04.10.2001 | ||
FI | 04.10.2001 | ||
LI | 04.10.2001 | ||
NL | 04.10.2001 | ||
PT | 04.01.2002 | ||
SE | 04.01.2002 | ||
DE | 05.01.2002 | ||
GB | 25.03.2002 | ||
IE | 25.03.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 04.10.2001 | |
BE | 04.10.2001 | ||
CH | 04.10.2001 | ||
FI | 04.10.2001 | ||
LI | 04.10.2001 | ||
NL | 04.10.2001 | ||
PT | 04.01.2002 | ||
SE | 04.01.2002 | ||
Former [2003/06] | BE | 04.10.2001 | |
CH | 04.10.2001 | ||
FI | 04.10.2001 | ||
LI | 04.10.2001 | ||
NL | 04.10.2001 | ||
PT | 04.01.2002 | ||
SE | 04.01.2002 | ||
Former [2003/01] | CH | 04.10.2001 | |
FI | 04.10.2001 | ||
LI | 04.10.2001 | ||
PT | 04.01.2002 | ||
SE | 04.01.2002 | ||
Former [2002/48] | FI | 04.10.2001 | |
PT | 04.01.2002 | ||
SE | 04.01.2002 | ||
Former [2002/33] | FI | 04.10.2001 | |
SE | 04.01.2002 | ||
Former [2002/27] | SE | 04.01.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4762654 (FUCHIGAMI NOBUHISA [JP], et al); | [A]US5318645 (YANG KUO-NAN [TW]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]US5362435 (VOLPE JOHN F [US]) |