EP0842718 - Tube machining apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.2001 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FABBRICA MACCHINE CURVATUBI CRIPPA AGOSTINO S.p.A. Via M. Buonarroti 3 I-22060 Arosio (Como) / IT | [1998/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Crippa, Aurelio Via N.Sauro, 11 22060 Arosio (COMO) / IT | [1998/21] | Representative(s) | Sutto, Luca Gambro Intellectual Property Department P.O. Box 98 41037 Mirandola (MO) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1998/21] | Sutto, Luca Bugnion S.p.A., Via Carlo Farini 81 20159 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 97830263.6 | 30.05.1997 | [1998/21] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0842718 | Date: | 20.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0842718 | Date: | 24.06.1998 | [1998/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0842718 | Date: | 05.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B21D43/00, B21D19/08, B21D41/00, B23Q39/04 | [1998/21] | CPC: |
B23Q39/04 (EP,US);
Y10T82/2514 (EP,US);
Y10T82/2518 (EP,US);
Y10T82/2521 (EP,US);
Y10T82/2524 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1999/10] |
Former [1998/21] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Rohrbearbeitungsvorrichtung | [1998/21] | English: | Tube machining apparatus | [1998/21] | French: | Dispositif à travailler les tubes | [1998/21] | Examination procedure | 12.02.1998 | Examination requested [1998/21] | 12.02.1998 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 31.05.1998 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.1998 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 25.02.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.06.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.09.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 06.07.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.1999 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.1999 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.1999 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 05.04.2000 | FR | 05.04.2000 | DE | 06.07.2000 | [2006/14] |
Former [2002/27] | ES | 05.04.2000 | |
DE | 06.07.2000 | ||
FR | 01.09.2000 | ||
Former [2002/13] | DE | 06.07.2000 | |
FR | 01.09.2000 | ||
Former [2001/16] | FR | 01.09.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH01127203 ; | [A]JPS62107824 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890818), vol. 013, no. 373, Database accession no. (M - 861), & JP01127203 A 19890519 (SUGA TEKKOSHO:KK) [X] 1,6,7 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19871021), vol. 011, no. 323, Database accession no. (M - 634), & JP62107824 A 19870519 (CHUO DENKI SEISAKUSHO:KK) [A] 2,4,9,10 * abstract * |